United States of America v. Marin et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Putnam County National Bank of Carmel, Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin, Samuel P. Utter, Car Lifts Plus, LLC, Dykeman Scrap Iron Inc., Philip D. Marin, Town of Southeast, Carl F. Marin and Carla L. Marin
Case Number: 7:2018cv09307
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Putnam County National Bank of Carmel waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
November 30, 2018 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Town of Southeast waiver sent on 10/17/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER: This Stipulation and Order is entered into by and between Plaintiff United States of America ("United States") and Defendants Carla L. Marin and Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin ("Stipulating Defendants,,), through their respective counsel. 1. The Stipulating Defendants were served with the summons and complaint in this matter on October 29, 2018, pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Dkt. Nos. 27-28). 2. The Stipulating Defendants do not challenge the sufficiency of service or the sufficiency of process in this matter. 3. The United States and the Stipulating Defendants agree that the Stipulating Defendants shall have until January 7, 2019 to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the complaint. 4. This stipulation shall not be deemed a waiver of any defenses that the Stipulating Defendants may assert other than respecting the sufficiency of service or process, including but not limited to any motion pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, other than under Rule I 2(b)(4)-(5). IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that a facsimile, copy, or PDF image of the stipulation shall be considered as effective and valid as of the date of the original. The time for defendants Carla L. Marin and Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 1/7/2019. Clerk shall terminate the letter-motion. (Doc. #32). SO ORDERED. (Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin answer due 1/7/2019; Carla L. Marin(individually) answer due 1/7/2019; Carla L. Marin(as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin) answer due 1/7/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/20/2018) (jca)
November 20, 2018 Filing 32 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Adam C. Ford dated 11/20/2018. Document filed by Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin, Carla L. Marin(individually), Carla L. Marin(as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin).(Ford, Adam)
November 13, 2018 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Carl F. Marin(as beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin) waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019; Carl F. Marin(individually) waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Philip D. Marin(individually) waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019; Philip D. Marin(as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin) waiver sent on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam C. Ford on behalf of Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin, Carl F. Marin(as beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin), Carl F. Marin(individually), Carla L. Marin(individually), Carla L. Marin(as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin), Philip D. Marin(individually), Philip D. Marin(as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin). (Ford, Adam)
November 5, 2018 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. Service was made by affixing summons, complaint, and other documents to door of premises, and by sending the same documents via U.S. mail. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Carla L. Marin(individually) served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018; Carla L. Marin(as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin) served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. Service was made by affixing summons, complaint, and other documents to door of premises, and by sending the same documents via U.S. mail. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
November 5, 2018 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Dykeman Scrap Iron Inc. served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, of the New York State Department of State. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 30, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Stipulation of Dismissal of Claim Against Samuel P. Utter Only served on Carla L. Marin, Philip D. Marin, Carl F. Marin, Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin, Putnam County National Bank of Carmel, Samuel P. Utter, Dykeman Scrap Iron Inc., Car Lifts Plus, LLC, Town of Southeast on 10/30/2018. Service was made by U.S. mail. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIM AGAINST SAMUEL P. UTTER ONLY: The parties stipulate and agree that Utter does not have a mortgage, lien, or other interest in property that is the subject of this action, and specifically in real estate located at 745 Route 216, Poughquag, New York 12570. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, it is hereby stipulated and agreed that the United States' cause of action against Utter only is heteby dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees, and Utter is hereby terminated as a party from the docket of this action. This Stipulation of Dismissal contains the entire agreement between the United States and Utter, and no statements, representations, promises, agreements, or negotiations, oral or otherwise, between the parties or their counsel that are not included herein shall be of any force or effect and further set forth in this Order. The Clerk is directed to terminate defendant Samuel P. Utter. SO ORDERED. (Samuel P. Utter terminated.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/29/2018) (rro)
October 29, 2018 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #23 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
October 29, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Samuel P. Utter. Document filed by United States of America. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff..(Dolinger, Samuel)
October 12, 2018 Filing 22 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 12, 2018 Filing 21 COMPLAINT against Car Lifts Plus, LLC, Dykeman Scrap Iron Inc., Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin, Carl F. Marin(as beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin), Carl F. Marin(individually), Carla L. Marin(individually), Carla L. Marin(as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin), Philip D. Marin(individually), Philip D. Marin(as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin), Putnam County National Bank of Carmel, Town of Southeast, Samuel P. Utter. Document filed by United States of America.(Dolinger, Samuel)
October 12, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Car Lifts Plus, LLC, Dykeman Scrap Iron Inc., Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin, Carl F. Marin, Carla L. Marin, Philip D. Marin, Putnam County National Bank of Carmel, Town of Southeast, Samuel P. Utter, Carla L. Marin, Philip D. Marin, Carl F. Marin added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by United States of America. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Dolinger, Samuel)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town of Southeast. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samuel P. Utter. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Putnam County National Bank of Carmel. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philip D. Marin. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dykeman Scrap Iron Inc.. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carla L. Marin. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl F. Marin. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Car Lifts Plus, LLC. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Samuel Hilliard Dolinger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Carla L. Marin; Philip D. Marin; Carl F. Marin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Samuel Hilliard Dolinger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Putnam; Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
October 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Samuel Hilliard Dolinger to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): pdf case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption; Jury Demand Code - no selection. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jgo).
October 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Samuel Hilliard Dolinger to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add parties: Carla L. Marin with party text 'as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin', Philip D. Marin with party text 'as co-executor and beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin', and, Carl F. Marin with party text 'as beneficiary of the Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin'; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Town of Southeast, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Car Lifts Plus, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dykeman Scrap Iron Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samuel P. Utter, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Putnam County National Bank of Carmel, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carl F. Marin, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Philip D. Marin, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Carla L. Marin, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dolinger, Samuel) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jgo).
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Car Lifts Plus, LLC, Dykeman Scrap Iron Inc., Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin, Carl F. Marin, Carla L. Marin, Philip D. Marin, Putnam County National Bank of Carmel, Town of Southeast, Samuel P. Utter. Document filed by United States of America.(Dolinger, Samuel) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Marin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County National Bank of Carmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Ana Beatriz Marin
Represented By: Adam C. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel P. Utter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car Lifts Plus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dykeman Scrap Iron Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip D. Marin
Represented By: Adam C. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Southeast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl F. Marin
Represented By: Adam C. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla L. Marin
Represented By: Adam C. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?