Long v. Griffin et al
Plaintiff: Maurice V. Long
Defendant: Ece, Thomas Griffin, Mr. Ail, Emily Willams, Dr. R. V. Bentivegna and Dr. Bernstein
Case Number: 7:2018cv09654
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Maurice V. Long, at Green Haven Correctional Facility P.O. Box 4000 Stormville, NY 12582, on 11/29/2018 Re: #8 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sbr)
November 29, 2018 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 11/29/2018 Re: Judge Nelson Stephen Roman #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Ail, R. V. Bentivegna, Bernstein, Ece, Thomas Griffin, Emily Willams.. (sbr)
November 29, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (sbr)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF SERVICE: To allow Plaintiff to effect service on Defendants Thomas Griffin, Superintendent of Green Haven; Dr. Bernstein, Medical Director of Green Haven; Emily Williams, Deputy Superintendent; Mr. Ece, Physical Therapy Supervisor; Mr. Ail, Physical Therapist; and R.V. Bentivegna, Medical Director, through the U.S. Marshals Service, the Clerk of Court is instructed to fill out a U.S. Marshals Service Process Receipt and Return form ("USM-285 form") for each of these defendants. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue a summons and deliver to the Marshals Service all of the paperwork necessary for the Marshals Service to effect service upon these defendants. Plaintiff must notify the Court in writing if his address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Thomas Griffin, Superintendent of Green Haven; Dr. Bernstein, Medical Director of Green Haven; Emily Williams, Deputy Superintendent; Mr. Ece, Physical Therapy Supervisor; Mr. Ail, Physical Therapist, and R.V. Bentivegna, Medical Director, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 11/21/2018) (rj)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Maurice V. Long.(sc)
October 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
October 26, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
October 23, 2018 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Maurice V. Long DIN No. 12-A-1489 Green Haven Correctional Facility P.O. Box 4000 Stormville, NY 12582. (aea)
October 23, 2018 Mailed a copy of #5 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Maurice V. Long DIN No. 12-A-1489 Green Haven Correctional Facility P.O. Box 4000 Stormville, NY 12582 ; Attn: Superintendent Green Haven Correctional Facility 594 NY-216, Stormville, NY 12582. (aea)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/22/2018) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR AMENDED IFP APPLICATION: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an amended IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 11/21/2018. Amended In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 11/21/2018. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/22/2018) (Attachments: #1 amended IFP application)(ees) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Maurice V. Long.(sac)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ail, R. V. Bentivegna, Bernstein, Ece, Thomas Griffin, Emily Willams. Document filed by Maurice V. Long. (sac)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Maurice V. Long.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Ail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Willams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. R. V. Bentivegna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice V. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?