Langella v. Mahopac Central School District et al
Plaintiff: Marsilio Langella
Defendant: Michael Sclafani, Brian Mahoney, Dennis Creedon, Ron Klamser, Anthony DiCarlo, Mahopac Central School District, John Augusta and Ronald Clamser
Case Number: 7:2018cv10023
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331ag
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 32 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Bryan D. Glass dated December 14, 2018 re: #31 LETTER MOTION for Conference For Leave to Move to Dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Caroline B. Lineen dated December 10, 2018. . Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Conference For Leave to Move to Dismiss the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Caroline B. Lineen dated December 10, 2018. Document filed by John Augusta, Ronald Clamser, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Brian Mahoney, Mahopac Central School District, Michael Sclafani.(Rudnicki, Karen)
December 6, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Chana Rudnicki on behalf of John Augusta, Ronald Clamser, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Brian Mahoney, Mahopac Central School District, Michael Sclafani. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rudnicki, Karen)
December 6, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis R. Silverman on behalf of John Augusta, Ronald Clamser, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Brian Mahoney, Mahopac Central School District, Michael Sclafani. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silverman, Lewis)
December 6, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Beth Lineen on behalf of John Augusta, Ronald Clamser, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Brian Mahoney, Mahopac Central School District, Michael Sclafani. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lineen, Caroline)
December 6, 2018 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Plaintiff on December 6, 2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by John Augusta, Ronald Clamser, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Ron Klamser, Brian Mahoney, Mahopac Central School District, Michael Sclafani. (Goldstein, Joshua)
December 6, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Matthew Goldstein on behalf of John Augusta, Ronald Clamser, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Ron Klamser, Brian Mahoney, Mahopac Central School District, Michael Sclafani. (Goldstein, Joshua)
December 4, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Brian Mahoney served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service was accepted by Amy Mahoney, Defendant Mahoney's Wife. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Anthony DiCarlo served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service was accepted by Anthony DiCarlo, Superintendent Mahopac Central Schools. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. John Augusta served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service was accepted by John Augusta, Athletic Director, former Interim Principal. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Ronald Clamser served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. Service was accepted by Ron Clamser. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Sclafani served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service was accepted by Michael J. Sclafani. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Dennis Creedon served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. Service was accepted by Dennis Creedon, Former Superintendent of Mahopac Central Schools. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Mahopac Central School District served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service was accepted by Melody LaRocca, District Clerk. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
November 9, 2018 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ronald Clamser. (pc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Mahoney. (pc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ronald Clamser, Former Human Resources Director / Assistant Superintendent, re: #14 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian Mahoney, Former Board Vice President, re: #14 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against John Augusta, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Brian Mahoney, Mahopac Central School District, Michael Sclafani, Ronald Clamser with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Marsilio Langella. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Right to Sue Letter)(Glass, Bryan)
November 2, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Bryan David Glass to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'C/o' Error; use 'c/o' or 'via' before second party name. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Sclafani. (dnh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Augusta. (dnh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dennis Creedon. (dnh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony DiCarlo. (dnh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mahopac Central School District. (dnh)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brian Mahoney, Former Board Vice President, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan) Modified on 11/2/2018 (dnh).
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Sclafani, Former Board President, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Augusta, Athletic Director / Former Interim Principal, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dennis Creedon, Former Superintendent of Schools, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony DiCarlo, Superintendent of Schools, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mahopac Central School District, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Glass, Bryan)
October 31, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 31, 2018 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 31, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glass, Bryan)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Augusta, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Ron Klamser, Brian Mahoney, Mahopac Central School District, Michael Sclafani. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15835014)Document filed by Marsilio Langella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Right to Sue Letter)(Glass, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langella v. Mahopac Central School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsilio Langella
Represented By: Bryan David Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sclafani
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Caroline Beth Lineen
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Represented By: Karen Chana Rudnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mahoney
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Caroline Beth Lineen
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Represented By: Karen Chana Rudnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Creedon
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Caroline Beth Lineen
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Represented By: Karen Chana Rudnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Klamser
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DiCarlo
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Caroline Beth Lineen
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Represented By: Karen Chana Rudnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahopac Central School District
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Caroline Beth Lineen
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Represented By: Karen Chana Rudnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Augusta
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Caroline Beth Lineen
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Represented By: Karen Chana Rudnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Clamser
Represented By: Joshua Matthew Goldstein
Represented By: Caroline Beth Lineen
Represented By: Lewis R. Silverman
Represented By: Karen Chana Rudnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?