Salu et al v. Miranda et al
Plaintiff: Gerard M Lynch and Rotimi Salu
Defendant: WMC Health, Denise Miranda, Mary B Rocco, David Molik, NYS Justice Center, Elizabeth Devane, Diamond Healthcare Corporation and Louis P. Renzi
Case Number: 7:2018cv10399
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981ra
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael David Diederich, Jr., to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #16 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption Error; the caption on the Summons must exactly match the caption on the pleading. Do not use abbreviations. If the entire caption does not fit list the leading defendant followed by et al. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Diamond Healthcare Corporation. (dnh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WMC Health. (dnh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louis P. Renzi. (dnh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Molik. (dnh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elizabeth Devane. (dnh)
January 3, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Diamond Healthcare Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WMC Health, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louis P. Renzi, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Molik, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elizabeth Devane, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WMC Health, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael) Modified on 1/4/2019 (dnh).
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louis P. Renzi, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael) Modified on 1/4/2019 (dnh).
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Molik, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael) Modified on 1/4/2019 (dnh).
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elizabeth Devane, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael) Modified on 1/4/2019 (dnh).
January 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael David Diederich, Jr., to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; The caption on the Summons must directly correspond to the pleading. Do not use abbreviations. If the entire caption does not fit list the leading defendant followed et al. Defendant name must exactly match the party of record, do not use abbreviations. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 31, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Diamond Healthcare Corp, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael) Modified on 1/3/2019 (dnh).
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WMC Health, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael) Modified on 1/3/2019 (dnh).
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louis P. Renzi, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael) Modified on 1/3/2019 (dnh).
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Molik, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael) Modified on 1/3/2019 (dnh).
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elizabeth Devane, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael) Modified on 1/3/2019 (dnh).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Declaration of Michael Diederich, Jr. in support of Plaintiffs' In Forma Pauperis Application granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ENDORSEMENT: IFP Application of both Plaintiffs is Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/06/2018) (ama)
December 6, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
December 6, 2018 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 18cv7757 and declined by Judge Nelson S Roman and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Denise Miranda. (sj)
November 9, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 7:18cv7757. (sj)
November 9, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 9, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
November 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Michael David Diederich, Jr. to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
November 9, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael David Diederich, Jr.. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; County code Westchester; Fee Status code fp (in forma pauperis). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1981; the County code has been modified to Rockland; the Fee Status code has been modified to pend (IFP pending). (sj)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Denise Miranda, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Diederich, Michael)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Michael Diederich, Jr. re: that this action be filed as related to 18-Cv-7757. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu.(Diederich, Michael) Modified on 11/9/2018 (sj).
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Diederich, Michael)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis by Mr. Salu and Mr. Lynch. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu.(Diederich, Michael)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diamond Healthcare Corporation, Elizabeth Devane, Denise Miranda, David Molik, NYS Justice Center, Louis P. Renzi, Mary B Rocco, WMC Health. Document filed by Gerard M Lynch, Rotimi Salu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Article 78 petition, #2 Exhibit Article 78 Memo of Law)(Diederich, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salu et al v. Miranda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMC Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary B Rocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Molik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYS Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Devane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis P. Renzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard M Lynch
Represented By: Michael David Diederich, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rotimi Salu
Represented By: Michael David Diederich, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?