Glover v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Whitney Glover and Whitney Glover, individually
Defendant: St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 7:2018cv10504
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER M10-468: The United States Attorney's Office shall notify the Court immediately upon the restoration of Department of Justice funding. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/27/18) (yv)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Judith Levine on behalf of United States of America. (Levine, Danielle)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service was accepted by Jill Shea, managing agent. Document filed by Whitney Glover. (Pluchino, Candice)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States of America served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Whitney Glover, individually. (Pluchino, Candice)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn C. Collins on behalf of St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital. (Collins, Kathryn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint. Document filed by St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital.(Rubin, Wayne)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Montefiore Health Systems, Inc. for St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital. Document filed by St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital.(Rubin, Wayne)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Amended Complaint, against St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital, United States of America with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Whitney Glover. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint,.(Pluchino, Candice)
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Candice A. Pluchino to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all parties whom the pleading is against were not selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #2 Amended Complaint, against United States of America with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Whitney Glover. Related document: #2 Amended Complaint,.(Pluchino, Candice) Modified on 11/20/2018 (pne).
November 16, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Whitney Glover, individually added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Whitney Glover, individually. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Pluchino, Candice)
November 16, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Whitney Glover added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Whitney Glover. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Pluchino, Candice)
November 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Candice A. Pluchino to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; The first filed complaint must be refiled correctly before an Amended Complaint can be approved. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pluchino, Candice)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Whitney Glover. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Pluchino, Candice) Modified on 11/15/2018 (pc).
November 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Candice A. Pluchino. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
November 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Candice A. Pluchino. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ; St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital ; Whitney Glover. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
November 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Candice A. Pluchino to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party Whitney Glover with the party text 'individually.' Not all of the filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Not all of the party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
November 14, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Candice A. Pluchino. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1391; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
November 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 14, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 14, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15899074)Document filed by Whitney Glover.(Pluchino, Candice) Modified on 11/14/2018 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's Cornwall Hospital
Represented By: Wayne Mitchell Rubin
Represented By: Kathryn C. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Danielle Judith Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Glover
Represented By: Candice A. Pluchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Glover, individually
Represented By: Candice A. Pluchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?