County of Dutchess v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: County of Dutchess
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam, Inc., 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co), Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. and 3M Company
Case Number: 7:2018cv10622
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of South Carolina acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:18-cv-03525, filed on 12/20/2018. (sjo)
December 20, 2018 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/18/2018) (sjo)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Andrew Calica dated 12/13/2018 re: In light of the imminent transfer of these actions to the AFFF MDL, and in the interests of conserving party and judicial resources and ensuring the efficient administration of these actions, the parties respectfully request that all current deadlines, including certain defendants' December 20, 2018 deadline to move or otherwise respond to the complaints in Allen and Bermo, be adjourned. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/17/2018) (jca)
December 11, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 11, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:17-cv-07131-KMK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
November 20, 2018 Case Stayed (kgo)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT with respect to #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ENDORSEMENT: The case is stayed until the JPML rules on the pending centralication motion. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/2018) (kgo)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Andrew J. Calica dated November 19, 2018. Document filed by 3M Company.(Calica, Andrew)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal with exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, and Related Case Statements served on Plaintiffs and Defendants on 11/15/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by 3M Company. (Calica, Andrew)
November 15, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 7:17-cv-07131. (dnh)
November 15, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 15, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
November 15, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew Jonathan Calica. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co) ; County of Dutchess. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-07057 (KMK). Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co).(Calica, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-07136 (KMK). Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co).(Calica, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-07134 (KMK). Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co).(Calica, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-09283 (KMK). Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co).(Calica, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-09178 (KMK). Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co).(Calica, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-09296 (KMK). Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co).(Calica, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-07131 (KMK). Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co).(Calica, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co).(Calica, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Calica, Andrew)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Dutchess. Case Number: 2018-53225. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15912416).Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Buckeye Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Tyco Consent, #4 Exhibit D - Chemguard Consent, #5 Exhibit E - National Foam Consent)(Calica, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Dutchess v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Dutchess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?