Hidalgo v. Latam Airlines Group
Plaintiff: SUSAN HIDALGO
Defendant: LATAM Airlines Group, S.A. and Latam Airlines Group
Case Number: 7:2018cv10794
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Hailey Jean Barthel on behalf of Latam Airlines Group. New Address: Condon & Forsyth LLP, 7 Times Square, New York, New York, 10036, 2128946849. (Barthel, Hailey)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hailey Jean Barthel on behalf of Latam Airlines Group. (Barthel, Hailey)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony U Battista on behalf of Latam Airlines Group. (Battista, Anthony)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arnold I Bernstein on behalf of Susan Hidalgo(as Mother and Natural Guardian of A.M., an Infant). (Bernstein, Arnold)
December 3, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 3, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
December 3, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ariella Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ariella Bernstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Susan Hidalgo; Latam Airlines Group. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (sj)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bernstein, Ariella)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against LATAM AIRLINES GROUP. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15941115)Document filed by SUSAN HIDALGO, SUSAN HIDALGO.(Bernstein, Ariella) Modified on 12/3/2018 (sj).
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against LATAM Airlines Group, S.A.. Document filed by SUSAN HIDALGO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernstein, Ariella) Modified on 11/20/2018 (pne).
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against SUSAN HIDALGO. Document filed by SUSAN HIDALGO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernstein, Ariella) Modified on 11/20/2018 (pne).
November 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ariella Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 11/26/2018. (pne)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against LATAM Airlines Group, S.A.. Document filed by SUSAN HIDALGO.(Bernstein, Ariella) Modified on 12/3/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hidalgo v. Latam Airlines Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN HIDALGO
Represented By: Ariella Bernstein
Represented By: Arnold I Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATAM Airlines Group, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latam Airlines Group
Represented By: Hailey Jean Barthel
Represented By: Anthony U Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?