Explus, Inc. v. Veria Lifestyle Inc. et al
Plaintiff: EXPLUS INC. and Explus, Inc.
Defendant: County Of Sullivan Industrial Development Agency, CANARA BANK and VERIA LIFESTYLE INC.
Case Number: 7:2018cv10992
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Explus, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Rosen, Jared)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Benjamin Lipschitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 14). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/12/2018) (rj)
December 12, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 FIRST MOTION for Benjamin Lipschitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Southern District of New York; Case No. 7:18-cv-10992. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16038148. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Cle. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 FIRST MOTION for Benjamin Lipschitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Southern District of New York; Case No. 7:18-cv-10992. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16038148. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Veria Lifestyle Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order order for admission pro hac vice)(Lipschitz, Benjamin)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Canara Bank served on 12/5/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service was accepted by RAJESH KUMAR, Vice President. Document filed by Explus, Inc.. (Rosen, Jared)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Veria Lifestyle Inc. served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. Service was accepted by ABHISHEK SAHAJ, General Manager. Document filed by Explus, Inc.. (Rosen, Jared)
November 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jared Michael Rosen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 445,760,000; County code Sullivan. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 446,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to County Of Sullivan Industrial Development Agency. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Explus, Inc..(Rosen, Jared)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Canara Bank. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Veria Lifestyle Inc.. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jared Michael Rosen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified:EXPLUS, INC.,VERIA LIFESTYLE INC.,CANARA BANK, COUNTY OF SULLIVAN INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT AGENCY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Scott Rosen on behalf of EXPLUS INC.. (Rosen, Gary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to COUNTY OF SULLIVAN INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENT AGENCY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by EXPLUS INC.. (Rosen, Jared)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CANARA BANK, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by EXPLUS INC.. (Rosen, Jared)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VERIA LIFESTYLE INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by EXPLUS INC.. (Rosen, Jared)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rosen, Jared)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by EXPLUS INC.. (Rosen, Jared)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CANARA BANK, County Of Sullivan Industrial Development Agency, VERIA LIFESTYLE INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15956913)Document filed by EXPLUS INC..(Rosen, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Explus, Inc. v. Veria Lifestyle Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Sullivan Industrial Development Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANARA BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIA LIFESTYLE INC.
Represented By: Benjamin Lipschitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXPLUS INC.
Represented By: Jared Michael Rosen
Represented By: Gary Scott Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Explus, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Michael Rosen
Represented By: Gary Scott Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?