Maldonado v. Town Of Greenburgh et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Maldonado
Defendant: Detective/Paramedic Sean Freeman, Paramedic Kenneth Morello, Police Officer Richard Maguire, Police Officer S H Deastis, Police Officer B P Doherty, Police Officer S M Harding, Police Officer Jean-Paul Lara, Police Officer R L Davis, Police Officer A B Preiser, Town Of Greenburgh, Lieutenant Gregory P Attalienti, Police Officer A Marzella, EMT f/n/u Thompson and Police Officer M C Cole
Case Number: 7:2018cv11077
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 d
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dylan C. Braverman on behalf of Kenneth Morello, f/n/u Thompson. (Braverman, Dylan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard L. Marasse on behalf of Town Of Greenburgh. (Marasse, Richard)
December 14, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gregory P Attalienti, M C Cole, R L Davis, S H Deastis, B P Doherty, Sean Freeman, S M Harding, Jean-Paul Lara, Richard Maguire.(Troetti, Thomas)
November 29, 2018 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth Morello. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to f/n/u Thompson. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean Freeman. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Maguire. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A B Preiser. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to R L Davis. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A Marzella. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M C Cole. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to B P Doherty. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to S M Harding. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to S H Deastis. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gregory P Attalienti. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jean-Paul Lara. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town Of Greenburgh. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 29, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Debra Sue Cohen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $20,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $20,000,000. (dnh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paramedic Kenneth Morello, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EMT f/n/u Thompson, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Detective/Paramedic Sean Freeman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer Richard Maguire, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer A.B. Preiser, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer R.L. Davis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer A. Marzella, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer M.C. Cole, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer B.P. Doherty, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer S.M. Harding, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer S.H. Deastis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lieutenant Gregory P. Attalienti, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Police Officer Jean-Paul Lara, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Town of Greenburgh, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Nancy Maldonado. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randolph M. McLaughlin on behalf of Nancy Maldonado. (McLaughlin, Randolph)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Debra Sue Cohen on behalf of Nancy Maldonado. (Cohen, Debra)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sullivan, Danielle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory P Attalienti, M C Cole, R L Davis, S H Deastis, B P Doherty, Sean Freeman, S M Harding, Jean-Paul Lara, Richard Maguire, A Marzella, Kenneth Morello, A B Preiser, f/n/u Thompson, Town Of Greenburgh. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15968076)Document filed by Nancy Maldonado.(Sullivan, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. Town Of Greenburgh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective/Paramedic Sean Freeman
Represented By: Thomas J. Troetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramedic Kenneth Morello
Represented By: Dylan C. Braverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Richard Maguire
Represented By: Thomas J. Troetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer S H Deastis
Represented By: Thomas J. Troetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer B P Doherty
Represented By: Thomas J. Troetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer S M Harding
Represented By: Thomas J. Troetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Jean-Paul Lara
Represented By: Thomas J. Troetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer R L Davis
Represented By: Thomas J. Troetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer A B Preiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Of Greenburgh
Represented By: Richard L. Marasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Gregory P Attalienti
Represented By: Thomas J. Troetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer A Marzella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMT f/n/u Thompson
Represented By: Dylan C. Braverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer M C Cole
Represented By: Thomas J. Troetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Maldonado
Represented By: Randolph M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Debra Sue Cohen
Represented By: Danielle Brittany Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?