Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds et al v. 50 / 50 Trucking, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds and Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456
Defendant: MJD Enterprises, Inc, 50 / 50 Trucking, Inc, Justin Divitto, Indvidually and Justin Divitto
Case Number: 7:2018cv11442
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that the time to submit theirs answers to the Complaint [Docket No. 1] for Defendants 50/50 Trucking, lnc., MJD Enterprises, Inc., and Justin Diviuo, individually, is extended to February 28, 2019. However, Defendants' time to respond or otherwise file a motion pursuant to Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is not extended by this Stipulation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (50/50 Trucking, Inc answer due 2/28/2019; Justin Divitto answer due 2/28/2019; MJD Enterprises, Inc answer due 2/28/2019.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/10/2019) (jca)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Daniel Kornfeld on 01/09/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by 50 / 50 Trucking, Inc, Justin Divitto, MJD Enterprises, Inc. (Cappillino, Donald)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald Cappillino on behalf of 50 / 50 Trucking, Inc, Justin Divitto, MJD Enterprises, Inc. (Cappillino, Donald)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456.(Kornfeld, Daniel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Secretary of Labor and Secretary of Treasury on 12/10/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MJD Enterprises, Inc. (jgo)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Justin Divitto. (jgo)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 50 / 50 Trucking, Inc. (jgo)
December 10, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
December 10, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
December 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Ernest Kornfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds; Justin Divitto. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Justin Divitto, Individually, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MJD Enteprises, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 50 / 50 Trucking, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 50 / 50 Trucking, Inc, Justin Divitto, Indvidually, MJD Enterprises, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16018160)Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456.(Kornfeld, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds et al v. 50 / 50 Trucking, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJD Enterprises, Inc
Represented By: Donald Cappillino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 50 / 50 Trucking, Inc
Represented By: Donald Cappillino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Divitto, Indvidually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Divitto
Represented By: Donald Cappillino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement and Legal Services Funds
Represented By: Daniel Ernest Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456
Represented By: Daniel Ernest Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?