Congregation of Ridnik et al v. Village of Airmont et al
Plaintiff: Rabbi Abraham Horowitz, Rabbi David Ribiat, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Rabbi Moishe Berger, Congregation Khal Boston and Congregation of Ridnik
Defendant: Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Suzanne Carley, Matt Ryan, Linda Carbone, Village of Airmont, Anthony Valvo, Arthur Katz, Stu Turner, Philip Gigante, Louis Zummo, Sean Mack, Pavle Lecei, Charles Picarelli, Douglas Whipple, Paul Marchesani, Corey Martin, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Eve Mancuso, Community Design Review Committee, Shlomo Pomeranz, Marino Fontana, Kevin Warbrick, Peter Blunnie, Dan Kraushaar, John Cornelius, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Russell Hock, William Philip, Ken Brezner, Scott Meier, Laurie Difrancesco, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Anthony Santucci, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Martin Kivell and Adriana Beltrani
Case Number: 7:2018cv11533
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The application is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 38). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/17/2019) (rj)
July 16, 2019 Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Alexander J. Eleftherakis dated July 16, 2019. Document filed by Adriana Beltrani, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Community Design Review Committee, Laurie Difrancesco, Philip Gigante, Dan Kraushaar, Eve Mancuso, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Stu Turner, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Louis Zummo.(Eleftherakis, Alexander)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application for extension of briefing schedule as set forth below is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 35). No further extensions. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 8/30/2019. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/14/2019) (rj)
June 14, 2019 Filing 36 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Stephen C. Dillard dated June 14, 2019 re: #35 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Leo Dorfman dated June 14, 2019. . Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Dillard, Stephen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 35 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Leo Dorfman dated June 14, 2019. Document filed by Adriana Beltrani, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Community Design Review Committee, Laurie Difrancesco, Philip Gigante, Dan Kraushaar, Eve Mancuso, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Stu Turner, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Louis Zummo.(Dorfman, Leo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Alexander J. Eleftherakis dated May 20, 2019 re: Defendants' Intent to File Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Adriana Beltrani, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Community Design Review Committee, Laurie Difrancesco, Philip Gigante, Dan Kraushaar, Eve Mancuso, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Stu Turner, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Louis Zummo.(Eleftherakis, Alexander)
May 6, 2019 Filing 33 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Community Design Review Committee, Laurie Difrancesco, Philip Gigante, Dan Kraushaar, Eve Mancuso, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Stu Turner, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Louis Zummo, Adriana Beltrani with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Chaim Cahan, Moishe Berger, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, David Ribiat, Congregation Khal Boston. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Bleiberg, Benjamin)
April 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman: Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/11/2019. Plaintiffs and Defendants counsel present. Court Reporter is Darby Ginsberg. Plaintiffs granted leave to file an amended complaint by May 6, 2019. Two weeks thereafter, by May 20, 2019, Defendants will either file an answer or inform the Court and Plaintiffs counsel in writing of their intention to file a motion to dismiss. If the Defendants choose to file a motion, the briefing schedule is as follows: moving papers shall be served not filed June 17, 2019; opposition shall be served not filed July 17, 2019; and reply shall be served July 31, 2019. The parties are directed to file all motion documents on the reply date, July 31, 2019, and to provide 2 copies of their respective motion documents to chambers on the dates the documents are served upon their adversary. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2019., Motions due by 6/17/2019., Replies due by 7/31/2019., Responses due by 7/17/2019). (Court Reporter Darby Ginsberg) (gs)
April 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alan Samalin on behalf of Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Samalin, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Filing 31 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Stephen C. Dillard dated 3/25/2019 re: Request for an adjournment of hearing. ENDORSEMENT: Pre-Motion Conference adjourned from April 5, 2019 until April 11, 2019 at 11:30 am., Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/25/2019) (rj)
March 22, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #31 TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rro)
March 22, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #32 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rro)
March 22, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE re: #28 Letter,,, (Letter addressed to Judge Nelson S. Roman from Stephen C. Dillard dated March 22, 2019). Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Dillard, Stephen)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #28 Letter re: Pre-Motion Conference and Anticipated Bases for Motion to Dismiss, filed by Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Suzanne Carley, Community Design Review Committee, Scott Meier, Martin Kivell, Paul Marchesani, Peter Blunnie, Douglas Whipple, Village of Airmont, Dan Kraushaar, Shlomo Pomeranz, Anthony Santucci, Sean Mack, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Philip Gigante, John Cornelius, Russell Hock, Louis Zummo, Arthur Katz, Eve Mancuso, Ken Brezner, Charles Picarelli, Laurie Difrancesco, Anthony Valvo, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, William Philip, Marino Fontana, Corey Martin, Kevin Warbrick, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Stu Turner, Linda Carbone, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Pavle Lecei., ENDORSEMENT: In-Person Pre-Motion conference scheduled for April 5, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Opposing party to state position in writing (not to exceed 3 pages ) by March 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/19/2019) (rj)
March 18, 2019 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Leo Dorfman dated March 18, 2019 re: Pre-Motion Conference and Anticipated Bases for Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Peter Blunnie, Ken Brezner, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Linda Carbone, Suzanne Carley, Community Design Review Committee, John Cornelius, Laurie Difrancesco, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Marino Fontana, Philip Gigante, Russell Hock, Arthur Katz, Martin Kivell, Dan Kraushaar, Pavle Lecei, Sean Mack, Eve Mancuso, Paul Marchesani, Corey Martin, Scott Meier, William Philip, Charles Picarelli, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Anthony Santucci, Stu Turner, Anthony Valvo, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Kevin Warbrick, Douglas Whipple, Louis Zummo.(Dorfman, Leo)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION OF PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, as counsel for the parties hereto, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the proceeding, the above entitled proceeding and all claims asserted herein are hereby discontinued against Defendant Matt Ryan, with prejudice and without costs against any party, and as further set forth in this Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance with Prejudice. So ordered. Matt Ryan terminated. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 2/5/2019) (rjm)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties, as follows: 1. All Defendants, except Matt Ryan, hereby waive the defense of insufficient service of process, but shall keep all other defenses or objections to this lawsuit, the Court's jurisdiction, and the venue of the action; and 2. The parties will jointly request that the Court set March 18, 2019 as the deadline for all Defendants, except Matt Ryan, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint; and 3. A facsimile or PDF copy of this Stipulation shall be deemed an original. So ordered. Peter Blunnie answer due 3/18/2019; Ken Brezner answer due 3/18/2019; Building Department of the Village of Airmont answer due 3/18/2019; Linda Carbone answer due 3/18/2019; Suzanne Carley answer due 3/18/2019; Community Design Review Committee answer due 3/18/2019; John Cornelius answer due 3/18/2019; Laurie Difrancesco answer due 3/18/2019; Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith answer due 3/18/2019; Marino Fontana answer due 3/18/2019; Philip Gigante answer due 3/18/2019; Russell Hock answer due 3/18/2019; Arthur Katz answer due 3/18/2019; Martin Kivell answer due 3/18/2019; Dan Kraushaar answer due 3/18/2019; Pavle Lecei answer due 3/18/2019; Sean Mack answer due 3/18/2019; Eve Mancuso answer due 3/18/2019; Paul Marchesani answer due 3/18/2019; Corey Martin answer due 3/18/2019; Scott Meier answer due 3/18/2019; William Philip answer due 3/18/2019; Charles Picarelli answer due 3/18/2019; Planning Board of the Village of Airmont answer due 3/18/2019; Shlomo Pomeranz answer due 3/18/2019; Anthony Santucci answer due 3/18/2019; Stu Turner answer due 3/18/2019; Anthony Valvo answer due 3/18/2019; Village of Airmont answer due 3/18/2019; Village of Airmont Board of Trustees answer due 3/18/2019; Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals answer due 3/18/2019; Kevin Warbrick answer due 3/18/2019; Douglas Whipple answer due 3/18/2019; Louis Zummo answer due 3/18/2019. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 2/5/2019) (rjm)
February 4, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Matt Ryan and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Community Design Review Committee, Ken Brezner, Scott Meier, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Martin Kivell, Arthur Katz, Russell Hock, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, John Cornelius, Marino Fontana, Douglas Whipple, Sean Mack, Peter Blunnie, Laurie Difrancesco, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Pavle Lecei, Eve Mancuso, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Corey Martin, Linda Carbone, Anthony Valvo, William Philip, Stu Turner, Shlomo Pomeranz, Philip Gigante, Suzanne Carley, Paul Marchesani, Kevin Warbrick, Louis Zummo, Village of Airmont, Dan Kraushaar, Anthony Santucci, Charles Picarelli. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Dorfman, Leo)
February 4, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Leo Dorfman dated February 4, 2019 re: Stipulation to Set Deadline to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Peter Blunnie, Ken Brezner, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Linda Carbone, Suzanne Carley, Community Design Review Committee, John Cornelius, Laurie Difrancesco, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Marino Fontana, Philip Gigante, Russell Hock, Arthur Katz, Martin Kivell, Dan Kraushaar, Pavle Lecei, Sean Mack, Eve Mancuso, Paul Marchesani, Corey Martin, Scott Meier, William Philip, Charles Picarelli, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Anthony Santucci, Stu Turner, Anthony Valvo, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Kevin Warbrick, Douglas Whipple, Louis Zummo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Stipulation))(Dorfman, Leo)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #25 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #22 Motion for D'Lesli M. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 22). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/17/2019) (rj)
January 15, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for D'Lesli M. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D'Lesli M. Davis in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Tennessee Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, D'Lesli)
January 15, 2019 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. Related Document Number: #20 . (Davis, D'Lesli) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 1/15/2019 (wb).
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for D'Lesli M. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16191582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D'Lesli M. Davis in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Tennessee Certificate of Good Standing)(Davis, D'Lesli) Modified on 1/15/2019 (wb).
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis on behalf of Peter Blunnie, Ken Brezner, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Linda Carbone, Suzanne Carley, Community Design Review Committee, John Cornelius, Laurie Difrancesco, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Marino Fontana, Philip Gigante, Russell Hock, Arthur Katz, Martin Kivell, Dan Kraushaar, Pavle Lecei, Sean Mack, Eve Mancuso, Paul Marchesani, Corey Martin, Scott Meier, William Philip, Charles Picarelli, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Anthony Santucci, Stu Turner, Anthony Valvo, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Kevin Warbrick, Douglas Whipple, Louis Zummo. (Eleftherakis, Alexander)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leo Dorfman on behalf of Peter Blunnie, Ken Brezner, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Linda Carbone, Suzanne Carley, Community Design Review Committee, John Cornelius, Laurie Difrancesco, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Marino Fontana, Philip Gigante, Russell Hock, Arthur Katz, Martin Kivell, Dan Kraushaar, Pavle Lecei, Sean Mack, Eve Mancuso, Paul Marchesani, Corey Martin, Scott Meier, William Philip, Charles Picarelli, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Anthony Santucci, Stu Turner, Anthony Valvo, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Kevin Warbrick, Douglas Whipple, Louis Zummo. (Dorfman, Leo)
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian S. Sokoloff on behalf of Peter Blunnie, Ken Brezner, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Linda Carbone, Suzanne Carley, Community Design Review Committee, John Cornelius, Laurie Difrancesco, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Marino Fontana, Philip Gigante, Russell Hock, Arthur Katz, Martin Kivell, Dan Kraushaar, Pavle Lecei, Sean Mack, Eve Mancuso, Paul Marchesani, Corey Martin, Scott Meier, William Philip, Charles Picarelli, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Anthony Santucci, Stu Turner, Anthony Valvo, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Kevin Warbrick, Douglas Whipple, Louis Zummo. (Sokoloff, Brian)
January 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for D'Lesli M. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
January 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #20 MOTION for D'Lesli M. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16191582. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Blunnie, Ken Brezner, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Linda Carbone, Suzanne Carley, Community Design Review Committee, John Cornelius, Laurie Difrancesco, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Marino Fontana, Philip Gigante, Russell Hock, Arthur Katz, Martin Kivell, Dan Kraushaar, Pavle Lecei, Sean Mack, Eve Mancuso, Paul Marchesani, Corey Martin, Scott Meier, William Philip, Charles Picarelli, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Matt Ryan, Anthony Santucci, Stu Turner, Anthony Valvo, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Kevin Warbrick, Douglas Whipple, Louis Zummo. (pne)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Village of Airmont, Philip Gigante, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Paul Marchesani, Anthony Valvo, Peter Blunnie, Kevin Warbrick, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Martin Kivell, Arthur Katz, Charles Picarelli, Laurie DiFrancesco, Scott Meier, Matt Ryan, Linda Carbone, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Marino Fontana, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, John Cornelius, Douglas Whipple, William Philip, Russel Hock, Pavle Lecei, Ken Brezner, Community Design Review Committee, Dan Kraushaar, Eve Mancuso, Shlomo Pomeranz, Anthony Santucci, Louis Zummo, Stu Turner, Sean Mack, Suzanne Carley and Corey Martin, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Bleiberg, Benjamin)
January 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Benjamin David Bleiberg to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'as to' docket entry text must list all of the parties whom summons is for;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendants. See Attached Rider., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Bleiberg, Benjamin) Modified on 1/4/2019 (jgo).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Jordan Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So ordered. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 11). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/20/2018) (rjm)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Stephen C. Dillard. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/19/2018) (ks)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Jordan Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16081512. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jordan Campbell in Support of Motion, #2 Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Jordan)
December 19, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Stephen C. Dillard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16077430. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 19, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Jordan Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16081512. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Stephen C. Dillard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16077430. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen C. Dillard in Support of Motion, #2 Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dillard, Stephen)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #3 Motion for Keisha Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/18/2018) (ks)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Lea Elyse Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/18/2018) (ks)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Lea Elyse Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16065025. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Lea)
December 17, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Lea Elyse Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16065025. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Congregation Khal Boston.(Bleiberg, Benjamin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef.(Bleiberg, Benjamin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik.(Bleiberg, Benjamin)
December 14, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #3 MOTION for Keisha Toni Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16052407. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Keisha Toni Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16052407. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Moishe Berger, Chaim Cahan, Congregation Khal Boston, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, David Ribiat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit In Support, #2 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Keisha)
December 11, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
December 11, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bleiberg, Benjamin)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter Blunnie, Ken Brezner, Building Department of the Village of Airmont, Linda Carbone, Suzanne Carley, Community Design Review Committee, John Cornelius, Laurie Difrancesco, Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith, Marino Fontana, Philip Gigante, Russell Hock, Arthur Katz, Martin Kivell, Dan Kraushaar, Pavle Lecei, Sean Mack, Eve Mancuso, Paul Marchesani, Corey Martin, Scott Meier, William Philip, Charles Picarelli, Planning Board of the Village of Airmont, Shlomo Pomeranz, Matt Ryan, Anthony Santucci, Stu Turner, Anthony Valvo, Village of Airmont, Village of Airmont Board of Trustees, Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals, Kevin Warbrick, Douglas Whipple, Louis Zummo. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16032346)Document filed by Chaim Cahan, Moishe Berger, Congregation of Ridnik, Abraham Horowitz, Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef, David Ribiat, Congregation Khal Boston.(Bleiberg, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Congregation of Ridnik et al v. Village of Airmont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Airmont Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Carley
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Carbone
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Airmont
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Valvo
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Katz
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stu Turner
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Gigante
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Zummo
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Mack
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavle Lecei
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Picarelli
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Whipple
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Marchesani
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Martin
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Airmont Board of Trustees
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve Mancuso
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Design Review Committee
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shlomo Pomeranz
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marino Fontana
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Warbrick
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Blunnie
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Kraushaar
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cornelius
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa-Ann Dimarsico-Smith
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Hock
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Philip
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Brezner
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Meier
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Difrancesco
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planning Board of the Village of Airmont
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Santucci
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Department of the Village of Airmont
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Kivell
Represented By: Brian S. Sokoloff
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Beltrani
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Eleftherakis
Represented By: Leo Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabbi Abraham Horowitz
Represented By: Benjamin David Bleiberg
Represented By: Stephen Cann Dillard
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Jordan Campbell
Represented By: D'Lesli M. Davis
Represented By: Michael Alan Samalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabbi David Ribiat
Represented By: Benjamin David Bleiberg
Represented By: Stephen Cann Dillard
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Jordan Campbell
Represented By: D'Lesli M. Davis
Represented By: Michael Alan Samalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaim Cahan
Represented By: Benjamin David Bleiberg
Represented By: Stephen Cann Dillard
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Jordan Campbell
Represented By: D'Lesli M. Davis
Represented By: Michael Alan Samalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Congregation Kollel Meor Yosef
Represented By: Benjamin David Bleiberg
Represented By: Stephen Cann Dillard
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Jordan Campbell
Represented By: D'Lesli M. Davis
Represented By: Michael Alan Samalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabbi Moishe Berger
Represented By: Benjamin David Bleiberg
Represented By: Stephen Cann Dillard
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Jordan Campbell
Represented By: D'Lesli M. Davis
Represented By: Michael Alan Samalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Congregation Khal Boston
Represented By: Benjamin David Bleiberg
Represented By: Stephen Cann Dillard
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Jordan Campbell
Represented By: D'Lesli M. Davis
Represented By: Michael Alan Samalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Congregation of Ridnik
Represented By: Benjamin David Bleiberg
Represented By: Stephen Cann Dillard
Represented By: Lea Patterson
Represented By: Keisha Russell
Represented By: Jordan Campbell
Represented By: D'Lesli M. Davis
Represented By: Michael Alan Samalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?