Austin v. Bertino et al

Plaintiff: Mr. Ruben S. Austin and Ruben S. Austin
Defendant: RJP Plumbing & Heating LLC, Mr. Paul J. Bertino and Paul J. Bertino
Case Number: 7:2019cv00155
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441mv
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from John M. Downing dated 2/13/2019 re: As discussed at the initial conference, defendants respectfully request that their answer be deemed amended to include an affirmative defense of emergency situation -- in this case, sun glare. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 2/15/2019) (mml)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Edward Monroe on behalf of Ruben S. Austin. (Monroe, James)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Deposition due by 3/29/2019. Fact Discovery due by 5/30/2019. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2019. Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 2/12/2019) (mml)
February 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 2/12/2019. Defendants' counsel appears telephonically. The Court directs Plaintiff's counsel (John Dupee, Esq.) to file a Notice of Appearance. Case Management Plan is signed. The Court permits the Defendant(s) to amend the Answer via letter without objection from the Plaintiff. Submit pre-motion letter(s) by July 3, 2019; opposition due July 10, 2019. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb) (wc) Modified on 2/12/2019 (wc).
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Ruben S. Austin.(Monroe, James)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
January 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John M. Downing, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1332; Dollar Demand $100,000,000; County code Sullivan; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1441mv; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
January 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
January 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Rule 7.1 Statement, Civil Cover Sheet served on Plaintiff on January 7, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Paul J. Bertino, RJP Plumbing & Heating LLC. (Downing, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Paul J. Bertino, RJP Plumbing & Heating LLC.(Downing, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Downing, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Sullivan County. Case Number: 2141/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16154508).Document filed by RJP Plumbing & Heating LLC, Paul J. Bertino. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint, #2 Verified Answer)(Downing, John)
January 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney John M. Downing, Jr to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 1/14/2019. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Bertino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJP Plumbing & Heating LLC
Represented By: John M. Downing, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Paul J. Bertino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Bertino
Represented By: John M. Downing, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Ruben S. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben S. Austin
Represented By: James Edward Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?