Conceicao v. Adeboye et al
Plaintiff: Regina Conceicao
Defendant: Sharafa Adeboye and Marcia Reyes
Case Number: 7:2019cv00597
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court has been advised that the parties have settled this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs, and without prejudice to the right to restore the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made by no later than April 8, 2019. To be clear, any application to restore the action must be filed by April 8, 2019, and any application to restore the action filed thereafter may be denied solely on the basis that it is untimely. All scheduled conferences or other scheduled court appearances are cancelled. Any pending motions are moot. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. (Motions due by 4/8/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/8/2019) (ne)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jared R. Cooper dated 3/8/2019 re: Settlement. Document filed by Regina Conceicao.(Cooper, Jared)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on 3/11/2019 at 10:00 a.m., at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 620, White Plains, NY 10601. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (kv)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Complaint. Document filed by Sharafa Adeboye, Marcia Reyes.(Gertzer, Michael)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Keith Gertzer on behalf of Sharafa Adeboye, Marcia Reyes. (Gertzer, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Sharafa Adeboye, Marcia Reyes. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16224180)Document filed by Regina Conceicao.(Cooper, Jared)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sharafa Adeboye, Marcia Reyes. (dnh)
January 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
January 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
January 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
January 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jared Ross Cooper. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $500,000,000; County code Rockland; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $500,000; the County code has been modified to Kings; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
January 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jared Ross Cooper to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; Do not use All defendants radio button. Select all defendants by holding down the 'Ctrl' button. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
January 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cooper, Jared)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sharafa Adeboye and Marcia Reyes, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Regina Conceicao. (Cooper, Jared)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16218977)Document filed by Regina Conceicao.(Cooper, Jared) Modified on 1/22/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conceicao v. Adeboye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharafa Adeboye
Represented By: Michael Keith Gertzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Reyes
Represented By: Michael Keith Gertzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Conceicao
Represented By: Jared Ross Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?