Glassberg v. Malmrose et al

Plaintiff: Jay Lee Glassberg
Defendant: Paul E. Malmrose and Tighe & Bond, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00767
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332tm
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Disclosure Demands served on Klein & Folchetti on March 19, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Paul E. Malmrose, Tighe & Bond, Inc.. (Sestito, Maria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Paul E. Malmrose, Tighe & Bond, Inc..(Sestito, Maria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Paul E. Malmrose, Tighe & Bond, Inc..(Sestito, Maria)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tighe & Bond, Inc.. (dnh)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul E. Malmrose. (dnh)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tighe & Bond, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jay Lee Glassberg. (Folchetti, Robert)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul E. Malmrose, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jay Lee Glassberg. (Folchetti, Robert)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Folchetti, Robert)
January 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert W. Folchetti to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each summons request must be filed separately; multiple summons requests can not be filed in a single PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
January 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
January 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
January 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
January 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Robert W. Folchetti. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul E. Malmrose, Tighe & Bond, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jay Lee Glassberg. (Folchetti, Robert) Modified on 1/28/2019 (pne).
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul E. Malmrose, Tighe & Bond, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16244689)Document filed by Jay Lee Glassberg.(Folchetti, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glassberg v. Malmrose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Malmrose
Represented By: Maria Sestito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tighe & Bond, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Sestito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Lee Glassberg
Represented By: Robert W. Folchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?