Davis v. Power Authority of the State of New York et al
Plaintiff: Edward F. Davis
Defendant: Guy Sliker, Justin Driscoll, Sangeeta Ranade, Power Authority of the State of New York, Paul Belnick, Nancy Harvey, Rani Pollack, Kristine Pizzo and Gil C. Quiniones
Case Number: 7:2019cv00792
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Referring Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Edward F. Davis, at 2618 Liberty Ridge New Windsor, NY 12553, on 2/14/2019 Re: #8 Order of Service, via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (bwa)
February 14, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 2/14/2019 Re: Judge Kenneth M. Karas #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Power Authority of the State of New York, Guy Sliker, Sangeeta Ranade, Rani Pollack, Kristine Pizzo, Paul Belnick, Justin Driscoll, Nancy Harvey, Gil C. Quiniones. (bwa)
February 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Belnick, Justin Driscoll, Nancy Harvey, Kristine Pizzo, Rani Pollack, Power Authority of the State of New York, Gil C. Quiniones, Sangeeta Ranade, Guy Sliker. (bwa)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Defendants Power Authority of the State of New York, Guy Sliker, Sangeeta Ranade, Rani Pollack, Kristine Pizzo, Paul Belnick, Justin Driscoll, Nancy Harvey, and Gil C. Quiniones, and to deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/13/2019) (jca)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
February 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
February 7, 2019 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application, to Edward F. Davis 2618 Liberty Ridge New Windsor, NY 12553. (aea)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/6/2019) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Original Signature Received from Edward Davis re: #2 Complaint. (sc)
January 29, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Original Signature, to Edward F. Davis 2618 Liberty Ridge New Windsor, NY 12553. (aea)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE: Plaintiff is directed to submit a signed signature page to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signature Page due by 2/27/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/28/19) (Attachments: #1 Supplement signature page)(bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 28, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Edward F. Davis.(rdz)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Paul Belnick, Justin Driscoll, Nancy Harvey, Kristine Pizzo, Rani Pollack, Power Authority of the State of New York, Gil C. Quiniones, Sangeeta Ranade, Guy Sliker. Document filed by Edward F. Davis.(rdz)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Edward F. Davis.(rdz)
January 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Power Authority of the State of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Sliker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sangeeta Ranade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Authority of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Belnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rani Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Pizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gil C. Quiniones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward F. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?