International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224 v. Atlas Air, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224 and International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224
Defendant: Atlas Air, Inc. and Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv01002
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Atlas Air, Inc., Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc.. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Costello, Gillian)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Robert A. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/4/2019) (jca)
March 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Robert A. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16429070. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Robert A. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16429070. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Atlas Air, Inc., Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Siegel, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Conference (pre-motion conference) addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Mark W. Robertson dated March 1, 2019. Document filed by Atlas Air, Inc., Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc..(Robertson, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc. for Atlas Air, Inc.. Document filed by Atlas Air, Inc..(Robertson, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate DHL Network Operations (USA), Inc., Other Affiliate Deutsche Post AG for Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc.. Document filed by Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc..(Robertson, Mark)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Wayne Robertson on behalf of Atlas Air, Inc., Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc.. (Robertson, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer on behalf of International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224. (Sprotzer, Elizabeth)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc.. (jgo)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atlas Air, Inc.. (jgo)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Costello, Gillian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc., re: #5 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224. (Costello, Gillian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Atlas Air, Inc., re: #5 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224. (Costello, Gillian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION..Document filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Costello, Gillian)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gillian Costello to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
February 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gillian Costello. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gillian Costello to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gillian Costello to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gillian Costello. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by International Brotherhood Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224. (Costello, Gillian) Modified on 2/4/2019 (jgo).
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Atlas Air, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by International Brotherhood Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224. (Costello, Gillian) Modified on 2/4/2019 (jgo).
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Costello, Gillian) Modified on 2/4/2019 (jgo).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16279639).Document filed by International Brotherhood Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Costello, Gillian) Modified on 2/4/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224 v. Atlas Air, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Air, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Siegel
Represented By: Mark Wayne Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polar Air Cargo Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A Siegel
Represented By: Mark Wayne Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224
Represented By: Gillian Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Airline Division and its Local Affiliate, Airline Professionals Association Teamsters Local Union No. 1224
Represented By: Gillian Costello
Represented By: Elizabeth Rachel Sprotzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?