Cianci v. Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michele Cianci
Defendant: Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc. and Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv01008
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Consent Filing. Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palitz, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael J. Palitz dated March 25, 2019 re: #23 LETTER MOTION for Conference to address Defendant's contemplated motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Collective Action Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Eli Z. Freedberg dated March 22, 2019. . Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Palitz, Michael)
March 22, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Conference to address Defendant's contemplated motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Collective Action Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Eli Z. Freedberg dated March 22, 2019. Document filed by Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC.(Freedberg, Eli)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #21 Letter filed by Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on 5/7/19, at 2:00. So Ordered. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 5/7/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/19/2019) (anc)
March 18, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Eli Freedberg dated March 18, 2019 re: Response to plaintiff's request for Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC.(Freedberg, Eli)
March 18, 2019 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Other Affiliate Bright Horizons Family Solutions Inc. for Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC. Document filed by Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC.(Freedberg, Eli)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregg I. Shavitz on behalf of Michele Cianci. (Shavitz, Gregg)
March 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/18/2019 (jca)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Motion Conference. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/14/2019) (jca)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF GREGG I. SHAVITZ granting #13 Motion for Gregg I. Shavitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Motion of Gregg I. Shavitz, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/14/19) (yv)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Eli Freedberg dated March 13, 2019. Document filed by Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC.(Freedberg, Eli)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michele Cianci. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Palitz, Michael)
March 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Gregg I. Shavitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16481524. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Gregg I. Shavitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16481524. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg)
March 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND DISMISS DEFENDANT BRIGHT HORIZONS FAMILY SOLUTIONS, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE: The parties hereby stipulate and agree that:1. The parties conferred regarding the legal employer of Plaintiff and the putative Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") collective action members, and Defendant represented that Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC is the legal employer under the FLSA. 2. Plaintiff agreed to amend the complaint to name Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC as the Defendant and to refine certain allegations which the parties discussed. The proposed first Amended Complaint is attached as Exhibit A. 3. Based upon Defendant's representations concerning the employer for Plaintiff and the putative FLSA collective action members, Plaintiff agreed to dismiss Defendant Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc. without prejudice. 4. If accepted by the Court, Plaintiff will file the proposed first Amended Complaint and Defendant will respond to the Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/8/2019) (anc)
March 10, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. s. 216(b). Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palitz, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Premotion) to Address Plaintiffs' anticipated Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael J. Palitz dated March 8, 2019. Document filed by Michele Cianci.(Palitz, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Palitz, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc. answer due 3/22/2019) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/4/2019) (jca)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Eli Freedberg dated February 28, 2019. Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc..(Freedberg, Eli)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Join. Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join)(Palitz, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent Filing. Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Attachments: #1 Consents to Join)(Palitz, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. Service was accepted by Leeann Jensen. Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Palitz, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Palitz, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc.. (pne)
February 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
February 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael John Palitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (pne)
February 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael John Palitz to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet can not be filed as an attachment to another document; civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Palitz, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16281069)Document filed by Michele Cianci. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Palitz, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cianci v. Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Horizons Children's Centers LLC
Represented By: Eli Zev Freedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Cianci
Represented By: Michael John Palitz
Represented By: Gregg I. Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?