Stanley v. Direct Energy Services, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv03759
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Stay re: 54 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from D. Greg Blankinship dated March 31, 2021. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/31/2021) (kv)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/25/2020) (ama)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER re: 27 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Linda Stanley's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and (12)(b)(1). filed by Direct Energy Services, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Defendant' s Motion To Dismiss with respect to Plaintiff's unjust enrichment claim and to limit the scope of Plaintiff's NYGBL § 349(d)-7 arguments but denies it on all other grounds. As Plaintiff has already amended her Complaint once, the dis missal is with prejudice. Therefore, the Action will proceed on the remaining claims. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending Motion. (Dkt. No. 27.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/12/2020) (jca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Direct Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?