Denton-Lotts v. Putnam County Personnel Department et al

Plaintiff: Roxan Denton-Lotts
Defendant: Putnam County Personnel Department and Putnam County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 7:2019cv04680
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/2/2019.(mf)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/8/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/15) (Chan, Tsz)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Putnam County Personnel Department, Putnam County Sheriff's Department.(Randazzo, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Putnam County Sheriff's Department served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service was accepted by Cpt. Lisa Ortolano, Esq., Agent. Document filed by Roxan Denton-Lotts. (Wolnowski, Casimir)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Putnam County Personnel Department served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service was accepted by Jan Miller, Personnel Dept. Secretary. Document filed by Roxan Denton-Lotts. (Wolnowski, Casimir)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James A. Randazzo on behalf of Putnam County Personnel Department, Putnam County Sheriff's Department. (Randazzo, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Putnam County Personnel Department, Putnam County Sheriff's Department. (sj)
May 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
May 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Casimir Joseph Wolnowski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Putnam. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Dutchess. (sj)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Putnam County Personnel Department, and Putnam County Sheriff's Department, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roxan Denton-Lotts. (Wolnowski, Casimir)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wolnowski, Casimir)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Putnam County Personnel Department, Putnam County Sheriff's Department. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16925623)Document filed by Roxan Denton-Lotts.(Wolnowski, Casimir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denton-Lotts v. Putnam County Personnel Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxan Denton-Lotts
Represented By: Casimir Joseph Wolnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County Personnel Department
Represented By: James A. Randazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: James A. Randazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?