Can Man Carting, LLC et al v. Spiezio et al
Plaintiff: Andris Kurins and Can Man Carting, LLC
Defendant: Joseph Spiezio, IV, Joseph Spiezio, III, PINNACLE EQUITY GROUP, LLC, Jacqueline Spiezio, Louise Spiezio, SPIEZIO FAMILY HOLDINGS, LLC, Gloria Spiezio and Lianna Spiezio
Case Number: 7:2019cv04721
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Gloria Spiezio. (Buss, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2019 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Spiezio Family Holdings, LLC.(Buss, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pinnacle Equity Group, LLC.(Buss, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Spiezio Family Holdings, LLC. (gp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pinnacle Equity Group, LLC. (gp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Spiezio, IV. (gp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lianna Spiezio. (gp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacqueline Spiezio. (gp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Spiezio, III. (gp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gloria Spiezio. (gp)
May 28, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gloria Spiezio. The document was not properly formatted. (gp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louise Spiezio. (gp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spiezio Family Holdings, LLC, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pinnacle Equity Group, LLC, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Spiezio, IV, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lianna Spiezio, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jacqueline Spiezio, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Spiezio, III, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louise Spiezio, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - SUMMONS REQUEST (SEE DOCUMENNT #6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gloria Spiezio, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd) Modified on 5/28/2019 (gp).
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gloria Spiezio, re: #5 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd)
May 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Judd Burstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Civil Miscellaneous Case; Dollar Demand $12,200,000,000; County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000 (MAXIMUM DOLLAR AMOUNT ACCEPTED ON CM ECF); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
May 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Pinnacle Equity Group, LLC, Gloria Spiezio, Jacqueline Spiezio, Joseph Spiezio, III, Joseph Spiezio, IV, Lianna Spiezio, Louise Spiezio, Spiezio Family Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Andris Kurins, Can Man Carting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Burstein, Judd)
May 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Judd Burstein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the first page of the PDF attached for the Initial Pleading must be titled to indicate what type of document is being filed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 5/28/2019. (pne)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins.(Burstein, Judd)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Spiezio, III, Louise Spiezio, Lianna Spiezio, Jacqueline Spiezio, Joseph Spiezio, IV, Gloria Spiezio, Spiezio Family Holdings, LLC, Pinnacle Equity Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Can Man Carting, LLC, Andris Kurins. (Burstein, Judd)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burstein, Judd)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against PINNACLE EQUITY GROUP, LLC, SPIEZIO FAMILY HOLDINGS, LLC, Gloria Spiezio, Jacqueline Spiezio, Joseph Spiezio, III, Joseph Spiezio, IV, Lianna Spiezio, Louise Spiezio. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16934867)Document filed by Andris Kurins, Can Man Carting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Burstein, Judd) Modified on 5/23/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Can Man Carting, LLC et al v. Spiezio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Spiezio, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Spiezio, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PINNACLE EQUITY GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Spiezio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Spiezio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIEZIO FAMILY HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Spiezio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lianna Spiezio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andris Kurins
Represented By: Judd Burstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Can Man Carting, LLC
Represented By: Judd Burstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?