United States of America v. Peopleworks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Joseph Cervone and Peopleworks, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv05407
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7407
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Russell Marc Yankwitt on behalf of Joseph Cervone. (Yankwitt, Russell)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant Joseph Cervone's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 9/11/2019. No further extensions will be granted absent compelling circumstances. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (del)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Russell M. Yankwitt dated August 2, 2019. Document filed by Joseph Cervone.(Yankwitt, Russell)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Joseph Cervone served on 6/29/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service was accepted by Joseph Cervone. Document filed by United States of America. (Hogan, Alexander)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Peopleworks, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty. Document filed by United States of America. (Hogan, Alexander)
July 8, 2019 Mailed a copy of #10 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines, to Joseph Cervone 40 Caterson Terrace Hartsdale, NY 10530. (vba)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Letter filed by Joseph Cervone. ENDORSEMENT: Pro se defendant Joseph Cervone's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 8/12/2019. The Clerk is directed to (i) update defendant Cervone's address on the docket to: 40 Caterson Terrace, Hartsdale, NY 10530, and (ii) mail a copy of this Order to defendant Cervone at that address. Defendant Cervone is ORDERED to promptly inform the Court in writing if his address changes. Joseph Cervone answer due 8/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/8/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Joseph Cervone dated 7/2/19 re: I respectfully request an extension of time until August 12, 2019, to provide an answer in the aforementioned case. Document filed by Joseph Cervone.(sbr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Cervone. (dnh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Cervone, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Hogan, Alexander)
June 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander James Hogan to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant Name Error; the defendant name must appear first in the 'To:' section of the PDF with 'c/o' or 'via' before any second party names. For example, Joseph Cervone c/o Residential Reentry Center. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Cervone, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Hogan, Alexander) Modified on 6/12/2019 (dnh).
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander James Hogan to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o' or 'via';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peopleworks, Inc.. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexander James Hogan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander James Hogan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester; Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peopleworks, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hogan, Alexander)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Cervone, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hogan, Alexander) Modified on 6/11/2019 (jgo).
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hogan, Alexander)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Cervone, Peopleworks, Inc.. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Hogan, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Peopleworks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Alexander James Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cervone
Represented By: Russell Marc Yankwitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peopleworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?