C.M. et al v. Mount Vernon City School District
Plaintiff: C.M., C.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor, S.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor and S.M., individually
Defendant: Mount Vernon City School District
Case Number: 7:2019cv05496
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 11/6/2019. Motions due by 9/25/2019. Responses due by 12/18/2019 Replies due by 1/8/2020. (mml)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal; denying as moot #2 Motion to Consolidate Cases. As discussed at a case management conference held today and attended by all counsel, it is hereby ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' summary judgment motion is due September 25, 2019. 2. Defendant's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed in one brief due November 6, 2019. 3. Plaintiffs' reply as to their motion and opposition to defendant's cross-motion shall be filed in one brief due December 18, 2019. 4. Defendant's reply as to its cross-motion is due January 8, 2020. 5. Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate (Doc. #2) is DENIED AS MOOT. 6. Plaintiffs' motion to file the administrative record under seal (Doc. #6) is GRANTED. 7. By separate order, the Court will direct the Office of State Review to produce to plaintiffs a copy of the Certified Administrative Record. 8. The Clerk is directed to terminate plaintiffs' motion to consolidate (Doc. #2) and motion to seal (Doc. #6). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/26/2019) (mml)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Office of State Review is requested to place a copy of the Certified Administrative Record in the care and custody of counsel for plaintiffs-appellants. Plaintiffs' counsel shall then provide the Court with a hard copy of the Certified Administrative Record, which shall be filed under seal. In addition, plaintiffs' counsel shall provide to Judge Briccetti's Chambers an unredacted courtesy copy of the Certified Administrative Record. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/26/2019) (mml)
July 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Status Conference held on 7/25/2019. Order to follow. (dh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mount Vernon City School District.(Scapoli, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Mount Vernon City School District.(Scapoli, Thomas)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court will hold a case management conference on July 25, 2019, at 11:30 a.m., to discuss the timing of dispositive motion practice in these related cases. By July 22, 2019, defense counsel in 19 CV 5496 shall notice their appearance. ( Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/17/2019) (mro)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mount Vernon City School District. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mount Vernon City School District, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by C.M., C.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor, S.M., individually, S.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor. (McMahon, Geraldine)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by S.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor, S.M., individually, C.M., C.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor. (McMahon, Geraldine)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
June 18, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:18-cv-04409-VB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
June 13, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners C.M., C.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor, S.M., individually, S.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by C.M., C.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor, S.M., individually, S.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(McMahon, Geraldine)
June 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Geraldine A. McMahon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
June 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Geraldine A. McMahon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: C.M., Mount Vernon City School District. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (pne)
June 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Geraldine A. McMahon re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; C.M. must be added to the case a second time with party text "on behalf of L.M., a minor; S.M. must be added to the case twice - once with party text "individually", and a second time with party text "on behalf of L.M., a minor". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
June 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vincent L. Briccetti as possibly related to 18CV4409. (pne)
June 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST MOTION to Seal . Document filed by C.M. AND S.M. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF STUDENT L.M.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(McMahon, Geraldine)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geraldine A. McMahon on behalf of C.M. AND S.M. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF STUDENT L.M.. (McMahon, Geraldine)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Geraldine McMahon re: that this action be filed as related to 7:18-cv-04409-VB. Document filed by C.M. AND S.M. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF STUDENT L.M..(McMahon, Geraldine)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McMahon, Geraldine)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST MOTION to Consolidate Cases 7:18-CV-04409-VB AND 7:19-CV-05496. Document filed by C.M. AND S.M. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF STUDENT L.M.. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT)(McMahon, Geraldine)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mount Vernon City School District. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17070669)Document filed by C.M. AND S.M. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF STUDENT L.M.. (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT 1, #2 ATTACHMENT 2)(McMahon, Geraldine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.M. et al v. Mount Vernon City School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M.
Represented By: Geraldine A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor
Represented By: Geraldine A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.M., on behalf of L.M., a minor
Represented By: Geraldine A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.M., individually
Represented By: Geraldine A. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Vernon City School District
Represented By: Thomas Scapoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?