Zuffa, LLC v. Devito et al
Plaintiff: ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship and Zuffa, LLC
Defendant: Popfritz Inc., Frederick G Devito, Individually,, Frederick G Devito, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder and/or principal of Popfritz Inc., Bryn Mawr Tavern II and Frederick G. Devito
Case Number: 7:2019cv05523
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Frederick G. Devito served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service was accepted by EMELIA "DOE", Co resident. Service was made by sub-service and by mail. Document filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Frederick G. Devito served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service was accepted by EMELIA. Document filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frederick G. Devito, Frederick G. Devito. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Popfritz Inc.. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship, Frederick G Devito, Individually, Frederick G Devito, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder and/or principal of Popfritz Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Lonstein, Julie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant, Popfritz Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendant, Frederick G. Devito, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frederick G Devito, Individually,, Frederick G Devito, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder and/or principal of Popfritz Inc., Popfritz Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17077857)Document filed by ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint - Advertisements)(Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuffa, LLC v. Devito et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popfritz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G Devito, Individually,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G Devito, Individually, and as officer, director, shareholder and/or principal of Popfritz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryn Mawr Tavern II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G. Devito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZUFFA, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?