County of Rockland, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Rockland, New York
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. d/b/a CVS Caremark, Specgx, LLC, Richard Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, CVS Health Corporation, Cephalon, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., As Successor In Interest to Rite Aid Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Mallinckrodt plc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv05588
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331ra
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:19-op-45662, filed on 07/29/2019. (sjo)
July 26, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio. (sjo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio. (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/24/2019) (sjo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Gerard Parisi on behalf of County of Rockland, New York. (Parisi, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Richard Sackler, Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (dnh)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Purdue Pharma, L.P.; Purdue Pharma, Inc.; The Purdue Frederick Company; Richard Sackler; Mallinckrodt PLC; Mallinckrodt, LLC; SPECGX LLC; Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Noramco, Inc.; Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc.; Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC; McKesson Corporation; Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation; CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. d/b/a CVS Caremark; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; and Walgreends Boots Alliance, Inc., As Successor In Interest To Rite Aid Corporation,, re: #4 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County of Rockland, New York. (Parisi, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Gerard Parisi to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. The caption on the summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading, correct the plaintiff name in the caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Purdue Pharma, L.P.; Purdue Pharma,Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company; Richard Sackler;Mallinckrodt PLC; Mallinckrodt LLC; SPECGX LLC; Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Noramco, Inc.; Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc.; Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC; McKesson Corporation; Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation; CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. d/b/a CVS Caremark; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; and Walgreends Boots Alliance, Inc., As Successor In Interest To Rite Aid Corporation, re: #4 Complaint,,,. Document filed by County of Rockland, New York. (Parisi, Matthew) Modified on 6/18/2019 (dnh).
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Gerard Parisi to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; you must list all parties as to whom the summons is for in the "TO" field; if all names do not fit, write "See attached" and include a rider listing all parties. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Gerard Parisi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff); County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 3 (Federal Question); the County code has been modified to Rockland. (sj)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Matthew Gerard Parisi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Richard Sackler, Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #4 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17088212, paid on 6/14/2019. (sj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. d/b/a CVS Caremark, Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt plc, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Richard Sackler, Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., As Successor In Interest to Rite Aid Corporation. Document filed by County of Rockland, New York.(Parisi, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Matthew G. Parisi re: that this action be filed as related to 17-md-2804. Document filed by County of Rockland, New York.(Parisi, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Parisi, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Purdue Pharma, L.P.; Purdue Pharma, Inc.; The Purdue Frederick Company; Richard Sackler;Mallinckrodt, PLC; Mallinckrodt, LLC; Specgx LLC; Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.;Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Noramco, Inc.; Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc.; Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC; McKesson Corporation; Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation; CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. d/b/a CVS Caremark; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., As Successor In Interest To Rite Aid Corporation, re: Complaint. Document filed by County of Rockland, New York. (Parisi, Matthew) Modified on 6/17/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Rockland, New York v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Rockland, New York
Represented By: Matthew Gerard Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. d/b/a CVS Caremark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., As Successor In Interest to Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?