Maroney v. BPI Sports, LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Maroney
Defendant: BPI Sports, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv06107
Filed: June 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) BPI Sports, LLC. Document filed by Gregory Maroney. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Fraietta, Philip)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BPI Sports, LLC. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gregory Maroney. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid via CHECK: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $400.00. Receipt number 465401238950, paid on 7/2/2019. (jgl)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 7/8/2019. (pne)
June 29, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BPI Sports, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gregory Maroney. (Fraietta, Philip)
June 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraietta, Philip)
June 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BPI Sports, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00.)Document filed by Gregory Maroney.(Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maroney v. BPI Sports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPI Sports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Maroney
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?