McAllister et al v. Russell et al
Plaintiff: V.C. McAllister, III Vanessa Cowan McAllister as parent & natural guardian of, Vanessa Cowan McAllister, Kenneth McAllister and C. Cowan Vanessa Cowan McAllister as parent & natural guardian of
Defendant: Michelle Condo, Miles J. Russell and David Renneisen
Case Number: 7:2019cv06150
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332au
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Michelle Condo, Miles J. Russell., COUNTERCLAIM against Kenneth McAllister. Document filed by David Renneisen.(Gertzer, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. The extension is granted. SO ORDERED. David Renneisen answer due 9/5/2019. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/6/2019) (jca)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael K. Gertzer dated August 5, 2019. Document filed by David Renneisen.(Gertzer, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Keith Gertzer on behalf of David Renneisen. (Gertzer, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miles J. Russell. (pc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Renneisen. (pc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michelle Condo. (pc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Laub, Kenneth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Renneisen, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Kenneth McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister(as parent & natural guardian of V.C. McAllister, III), Vanessa Cowan McAllister(as parent & natural guardian of C. Cowan). (Laub, Kenneth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michelle Condo, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Kenneth McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister(as parent & natural guardian of V.C. McAllister, III), Vanessa Cowan McAllister(as parent & natural guardian of C. Cowan). (Laub, Kenneth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Miles J. Russell, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Kenneth McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister(as parent & natural guardian of V.C. McAllister, III), Vanessa Cowan McAllister(as parent & natural guardian of C. Cowan). (Laub, Kenneth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Michelle Condo, David Renneisen, Miles J. Russell. Document filed by Vanessa Cowan McAllister(as parent & natural guardian of V.C. McAllister, III), Kenneth McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister(as parent & natural guardian of C. Cowan), Vanessa Cowan McAllister.(Laub, Kenneth)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - COMPLAINT against David Renneisen, Miles J. Russell. Document filed by Kenneth McAllister.(Laub, Kenneth) Modified on 7/3/2019 (pc).
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenneth Andrew Laub. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kenneth McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister, Vanessa Cowan McAllister, Miles J. Russell, Michelle Condo, David Renneisen. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (pne)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Andrew Laub to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; summons requests should not be filed as attachments to another document. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kenneth Andrew Laub to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017; the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the civil cover sheet should not be filed as an attachment to another document. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kenneth Andrew Laub to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Kenneth McAllister must be added to the case two more times, once with party text "as parent & natural guardian of C. Cowan", and a second time with party text "as parent & natural guardian of V.C. McAllister, III"; all filers were not selected for the pleading; all parties whom the pleading is against were not selected; the pleading was not properly signed. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenneth Andrew Laub. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code Putnam; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to Westchester; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
July 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Michelle Condo. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-17176318)Document filed by Kenneth McAllister. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Condo, #3 Summons-Renneisen, #4 Summons-Russell)(Laub, Kenneth) Modified on 7/2/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAllister et al v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.C. McAllister, III Vanessa Cowan McAllister as parent & natural guardian of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Cowan McAllister
Represented By: Kenneth Andrew Laub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth McAllister
Represented By: Kenneth Andrew Laub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Cowan Vanessa Cowan McAllister as parent & natural guardian of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Condo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles J. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Renneisen
Represented By: Michael Keith Gertzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?