Laffin v. Metro-North RailRoad
Plaintiff: Richard Laffin
Defendant: Metro-North RailRoad
Case Number: 7:2019cv06350
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: The case is to be tried to a jury. Depositions due by 12/27/2019. Expert Deposition due by 3/31/2020. Fact Discovery due by 1/3/2020. Expert Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/26/2019) (mml)
August 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 8/26/2019. Case Management Plan is signed. Pre-motion letter(s) to be submitted by February 3, 2020; opposition due February 10, 2020. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 2/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) (wc)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Robert S. Goggin, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
August 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 FIRST MOTION for Robert S. Goggin, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #10 FIRST MOTION for Robert S. Goggin, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17354279, paid on 8/1/2019. (wb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST MOTION for Robert S. Goggin, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Richard Laffin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Bennett, Voci)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall attend a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on August 26, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Initial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro-North RailRoad.(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro-North RailRoad.(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Metro-North RailRoad served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service was accepted by Michelle Lamagoity Admin Manager of Legal Affairs. Document filed by Richard Laffin. (Bennett, Voci)
July 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so redesignated. (jc)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge re: Case Designation,. Document filed by Richard Laffin. (Bennett, Voci)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bennett, Voci)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North RailRoad. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Voci R Bennett. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Voci R Bennett to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection; Office code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Voci R Bennett. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North RailRoad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Laffin. (Bennett, Voci)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North RailRoad. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17212485)Document filed by Richard Laffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, Voci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laffin v. Metro-North RailRoad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North RailRoad
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Laffin
Represented By: Voci R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?