Vinluan v. Ardsley Union Free School District et al
Plaintiff: Maria Theresa C. Vinluan
Defendant: Steven Kastin, Joanne Gold, Ardsley Union Free School District, James Matera, Jeanne Farruggio, Lauren Allan and Rudy Arietta
Case Number: 7:2019cv06496
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer served on Maria Theresa C Vinluan on September 9, 2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Lauren Allan, Ardsley Union Free School District, Rudy Arietta, Jeanne Farruggio, Joanne Gold, Steven Kastin, James Matera. (Camhi, Stanley)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ardsley Union Free School District.(Camhi, Stanley)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Lauren Allan, Ardsley Union Free School District, Rudy Arietta, Jeanne Farruggio, Joanne Gold, Steven Kastin, James Matera.(Camhi, Stanley)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Steven Kastin on 7/19/19. Document filed by Maria Theresa C. Vinluan. (sbr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Laura Allan on 7/23/19. Document filed by Maria Theresa C. Vinluan. (sbr)
July 26, 2019 Mailed a copy of #9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to Maria Theresa C. Vinluan 95 Bradley Ave. White Plains, NY 10607. (aea)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carol A. Melnick on behalf of Ardsley Union Free School District. (Melnick, Carol)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint, addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Stanley A.Camhi, Esq. dated July 24, 2019. Document filed by Ardsley Union Free School District. The District's request for an extension of time until Sept. 9, 2019 to answer or respond to Plts's Compl. is granted. Clerk of the Court directed to mail a copy of this endorsement to pro se pltf, show proof of service on the docket and terminate the motion (doc. 8). So ordered. Ardsley Union Free School District answer due 9/9/2019. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/25/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint, addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Stanley A.Camhi, Esq. dated July 24, 2019. Document filed by Ardsley Union Free School District. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Camhi, Stanley)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stanley Albert Camhi on behalf of Ardsley Union Free School District. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Camhi, Stanley)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Rudy Arietta on 7/19/19. Document filed by Maria Theresa C. Vinluan. (sbr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on James Matera on 7/19/19. Document filed by Maria Theresa C. Vinluan. (sbr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Jeanne Farruggio on 7/19/19. Document filed by Maria Theresa C. Vinluan. (sbr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Ardsley Union Free School District on 7/15/19. Service was accepted by Barbara Koppel, District Clerk. Document filed by Maria Theresa C. Vinluan. (sbr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Maria Theresa C. Vinluan consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Maria Theresa C. Vinluan. (sac)
July 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz)
July 12, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lauren Allan, Ardsley Union Free School District, Rudy Arietta, Jeanne Farruggio, Joanne Gold, Steven Kastin, James Matera. (rdz)
July 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Lauren Allan, Ardsley Union Free School District, Rudy Arietta, Jeanne Farruggio, Joanne Gold, Steven Kastin, James Matera. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465407017251)Document filed by Maria Theresa C. Vinluan.(rdz)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinluan v. Ardsley Union Free School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kastin
Represented By: Stanley Albert Camhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Gold
Represented By: Stanley Albert Camhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardsley Union Free School District
Represented By: Stanley Albert Camhi
Represented By: Carol A. Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Matera
Represented By: Stanley Albert Camhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Farruggio
Represented By: Stanley Albert Camhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Allan
Represented By: Stanley Albert Camhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Arietta
Represented By: Stanley Albert Camhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Theresa C. Vinluan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?