Foster v. United Parcel Service of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew Foster and Matthew J. Foster
Defendant: United States Parcel of America, Inc. and United Parcel Service of America, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv06501
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Conference Defendant seeks a pre-motion conference regarding an anticipated motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Joshua S. Paster dated September 6, 2019. Document filed by United Parcel Service of America, Inc..(Paster, Joshua)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for United Parcel Service of America, Inc.. Document filed by United Parcel Service of America, Inc..(Paster, Joshua)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Seth Paster on behalf of United Parcel Service of America, Inc.. (Paster, Joshua)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RE-SCHEDULING NOTICE: The matter of Foster v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al., 19-cv-6501 (NSR) (LMS), has been re-scheduled from an in-person status conference on Tuesday, September 10, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. before the Hon. Lisa Margaret Smith, United States Magistrate Judge, to an in-person status conference on Tuesday, September 17, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 520. Please Note: Counsel seeking to reschedule an appearance must have all parties on the line prior to contacting Chambers. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 520, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 9/03/2019) (ama)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. United Parcel Service of America, Inc. waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Document filed by Matthew J. Foster. (Ranni, Joseph)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The matter of Foster v. United Parcel Service of America, 19-cv-6501 (NSR)(LMS), has been scheduled for an in-person status conference before the Hon. Lisa Margaret Smith, United States Magistrate Judge, on Tuesday, September 10, 2019, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 520. Please note: counsel seeking to reschedule an appearance must have all parties on the line prior to contacting chambers. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 520, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 8/5/2019) (jca)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Parcel Service of America, Inc.. (dnh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Joseph J. Ranni dated July 19, 2019 re: seeks a conference to schedule discovery. Document filed by Matthew J. Foster.(Ranni, Joseph)
July 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
July 18, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 18, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:18-cv-10925-NSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Parcel Services of America, Inc., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew J. Foster. (Ranni, Joseph)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph J. Ranni to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the summons PDF contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Parcel Service of America, Inc., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew J. Foster. (Ranni, Joseph) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ranni, Joseph)
July 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph J. Ranni to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption contains a typographical error; summons request must be linked to a pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph J. Ranni. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Matthew J. Foster, United Parcel Service of America, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
July 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joseph J. Ranni to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): incorrect basis of jurisdiction selected. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
July 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 18cv10925. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #5 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17236832, paid on 7/12/2019. (pne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against United States Parcel of America, Inc.. Document filed by Matthew Foster.(Ranni, Joseph)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph J. Ranni to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 7/22/2019. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18cv10925. Document filed by Matthew Foster.(Ranni, Joseph)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ranni, Joseph) Modified on 7/16/2019 (pne).
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ranni, Joseph) Modified on 7/16/2019 (pne).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Parcel Service of America, Inc., re: Complaint. Document filed by United States Parcel of America, Inc.. (Ranni, Joseph) Modified on 7/16/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. United Parcel Service of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Foster
Represented By: Joseph J. Ranni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Parcel of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service of America, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Seth Paster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?