S. et al v. Pleasantville Union Free School District
Plaintiff: G. S., D. S. and S. S.
Defendant: Pleasantville Union Free School District
Case Number: 7:2019cv06508
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Letter, filed by D. S., G. S. ENDORSEMENT: We can discuss this at the conference set for 9/27/19. In the meantime, my August 8 Order (Doc. 12) remains in effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/12/2019) (mml)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Marion M. Walsh dated August 9, 2019 re: Defendant's Request for Conference and Extension. Document filed by D. S.(on behalf of S.S. ), D. S.(Individually), G. S.(Individually), G. S.(on behalf of S.S. ).(Walsh, Marion)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #11 Letter Motion for Conference. Application Granted. Defendant must submit a letter of no more than 3 pages laying out its grounds for the motion by 9/13/19. Plaintiffs are to respond by letter of no more than three pages by 9/20/19. We will discuss the issue at a pre-motion conference on 9/27/19 at 2:30 p.m. Defendant does not need to answer prior to the conference. SO ORDERED. Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/08/2019) (ama)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Request that the defendant school district not be required to answer the Complaint and that the Court schedule a pre-motion conference whereby a schedule for a "summary judgment" disposition of the claim in the Complaint that the SROs decision should be vacated (and that of the Impartial Hearing Officer restored) can be addressed. It is further requested that the defendants time to answer the Complaint, if necessary, be extended until after the pre-motion conference.) addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Mark C. Rushfield, Esq. dated August 8, 2019. Document filed by Pleasantville Union Free School District.(Rushfield, Mark)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Craig Rushfield on behalf of Pleasantville Union Free School District. (Rushfield, Mark)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint,. Pleasantville Union Free School District served on 7/28/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service was accepted by Veronica Shea, District Clerk. Document filed by D. S.(on behalf of S.S. ); G. S.(Individually); G. S.(on behalf of S.S. ); D. S.(Individually). (Walsh, Marion)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pleasantville Union Free School District. (dnh)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pleasantvillve Union Free School District, re: #6 Complaint,. Document filed by D. S.(on behalf of S.S. ), D. S.(Individually), G. S.(Individually), G. S.(on behalf of S.S. ). (Walsh, Marion)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Pleasantville Union Free School District. Document filed by D. S.(on behalf of S.S. ), G. S.(Individually), G. S.(on behalf of S.S. ), D. S.(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SRO Decision, #2 Exhibit IHO Decision)(Walsh, Marion)
July 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marion M. Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong case number is on the PDF; deficient pleading must be properly filed and summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pleasantvillve Union Free School District, re: #4 Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by D. S.(on behalf of S.S. ), D. S.(Individually), G. S.(Individually), G. S.(on behalf of S.S. ). (Walsh, Marion) Modified on 7/19/2019 (jgo).
July 16, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners G. S., D. S., G. S., D. S. added. Party added pursuant to #4 Complaint, #1 Complaint,.Document filed by G. S., D. S., G. S., D. S.. Related document: #4 Complaint, #1 Complaint,.(Walsh, Marion)
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marion M. Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; filing court omitted from PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marion M. Walsh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $200,000,000; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $200,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Marion M. Walsh to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Marion M. Walsh to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; you must add G.S. and D.S. again on behalf of S.S.. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Marion M. Walsh. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: S.S.. The party was added to the case in error. (sj)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marion M. Walsh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: G.S.; D.S.; Pleasantville Union Free School District. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against G. S., S. S., D. S.. Document filed by G. S., S. S., D. S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SRO Decision, #2 Exhibit IHO Decision)(Walsh, Marion) Modified on 7/15/2019 (sj).
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Walsh, Marion)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pleasantvillve Union Free School District, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by D. S., G. S., S. S.. (Walsh, Marion) Modified on 7/15/2019 (sj).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Pleasantville Union Free School District. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17237443)Document filed by G. S., S. S., D. S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SRO Decision, #2 Exhibit IHO Decision)(Walsh, Marion) Modified on 7/15/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. et al v. Pleasantville Union Free School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. S.
Represented By: Marion M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. S.
Represented By: Marion M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. S.
Represented By: Marion M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasantville Union Free School District
Represented By: Mark Craig Rushfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?