Pizzuti v. Penachio Malara LLP et al
Plaintiff: Michele Pizzuti and Michael Pizzuti
Defendant: PENACHIO MALARA LLP, Anne Penachio, Anne J. Penachio, Esquire and Penachio Malara, LLP
Case Number: 7:2019cv06768
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Memo Endorsement, to Michele Pizzuti Reg. No. 51089-054 FCI Danbury 33 1/2 Pembroke Road Danbury, CT 06811. (aea)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 Objection (non-motion) filed by Michele Pizzuti. ENDORSEMENT: This case has been reassigned to Bankruptcy Court. The request should be made to the Bankruptcy Court directly. SO ORDERED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/7/2019) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION REMOVAL AND REQUEST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A MOTION AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW SEEKING REMAND TO THE NEW YORK STATE SUPREME COURT. Document filed by Michele Pizzuti. (vn)
July 22, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York. (jgo)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DUPLICATE ORIGINAL AMENDED STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court as related to Bankruptcy Court Case No. 15-22324 (RDD). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(a) any or all cases under title 11 and any or all proceedings arising under title 11 or arising in or related to a case under title 11 are referred to the bankruptcy judges for this district. (See 1:12-mc-00032 (M-10-468) Order Filed February 1, 2012) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (jgo)
July 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anne Julia Penachio. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 380 (Personal Property: Other); Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant). (sj)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anne Julia Penachio. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michele Pizzuti; Anne J. Penachio; Penachio Malara, LLP. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Penachio, Anne)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 57311/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17280853).Document filed by Anne Penachio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of Complaint, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of Complaint, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of Complaint, #4 Exhibit Part 4 of Complaint, #5 Exhibit Part 5 of Complaint, #6 Exhibit Part 6 of Complaint)(Penachio, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizzuti v. Penachio Malara LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Pizzuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pizzuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENACHIO MALARA LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Penachio
Represented By: Anne Julia Penachio, Off
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne J. Penachio, Esquire
Represented By: Anne Julia Penachio, Off
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penachio Malara, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?