Hebrank et al v. City of Newburgh
Plaintiff: Diane Hebrank, Ronald Hebrank, Maribel Hamilton Individually and as Parents and Natural Guardians of R.H., Roy Hamilton, Individually and as Parents and Natural Guardians of R.H, Michael Gorenstein, Roy Hamilton and Maribel Hamilton
3Rd Party Defendant: National Express LLC, John Does 1-10, SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc., Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Kidde PLC Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Fire Service Plus, Inc., United Technologies Corporation, Chemguard, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Kidde-Fenwalfire Fighting, Inc., National Express Group, PLC, Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings LLC, Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, National Foam Inc., The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co) and Federal Express Corporation
3Rd Party Plaintiff: City of Newburgh
Case Number: 7:2019cv06802
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Fire Service Plus, Inc.. Document filed by City of Newburgh. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Jacobs, Sanford)
August 9, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of South Carolina acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:19-cv-02219, filed on 08/08/2019. (sjo)
August 8, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 08/05/2019) (sjo)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sanford Gregg Jacobs on behalf of City of Newburgh. (Jacobs, Sanford)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J. Walsh, II on behalf of City of Newburgh. (Walsh, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Douglas)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the parties and their undersigned counsel that the time for Third-Party Defendants 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam, Inc., the Federal Express Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Kidde PLC Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., National Express, LLC, and the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Third-Party Complaint filed by Third-Party Plaintiff City of Newburgh, be and hereby is extended through and including the 30th day after a disposition by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on transfer of this action to the pending Multidistrict Litigation. If the matter is transferred, the parties agree that any pleadings deadlines shall be subject to orders entered in the MDL. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/24/2019) (mml)
July 23, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Roy Hamilton, Maribel Hamilton added. Party added pursuant to #5 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Roy Hamilton, Maribel Hamilton. Related document: #5 Notice of Removal,.(Fleming, Douglas)
July 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Maribel Hamilton; Roy Hamilton. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the similar case number is on the incorrect section of the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Douglas E. Fleming, III re: Document No. #5 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. add parties Maribel Hamilton and Roy Hamilton with party text 'individually';. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange. Case Number: EF007713-2017..Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Third Party Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- September 2017 MilSpec)(Fleming, Douglas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). (Calica, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jonathan Calica on behalf of The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). (Calica, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fleming, Douglas) Modified on 7/23/2019 (jgo).
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Orange. Case Number: EF007713-2017. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17289184).Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Third Party Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- September 2017 MilSpec.)(Fleming, Douglas) Modified on 7/23/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebrank et al v. City of Newburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hebrank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Hebrank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Hamilton Individually and as Parents and Natural Guardians of R.H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Hamilton, Individually and as Parents and Natural Guardians of R.H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gorenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribel Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: National Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Angus International Safety Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kidde PLC Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chubb Fire, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fire Service Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kidde-Fenwalfire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: National Express Group, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company
Represented By: Douglas E. Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: National Foam Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: City of Newburgh
Represented By: Sanford Gregg Jacobs
Represented By: John J. Walsh, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?