Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Conesicecreamcorp. et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Binyamin Yitchakov, CONESICECREAMCORP. and Yoel Friedman
Case Number: 7:2019cv06877
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Yoel Friedman served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service was accepted by Recipient, male. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Binyamin Yitchakov served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. Service was accepted by Resident, Jane Doe. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Conesicecreamcorp. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. Service was accepted by Stef Marie, Secretary of State of State of New York. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yoel Friedman. (dnh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Binyamin Yitchakov. (dnh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Conesicecreamcorp.. (dnh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yoel Friedman, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Binyamin Yitchakov, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Conesicecreamcorp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nicolello, Richard)
July 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard J. Nicolello to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney information was omitted from the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard J. Nicolello to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
July 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard J. Nicolello. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CONESICECREAMCORP.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CONESICECREAMCORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard) Modified on 7/25/2019 (dnh).
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BINYAMIN YITCHAKOV, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard) Modified on 7/25/2019 (dnh).
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to YOEL FRIEDMAN, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard) Modified on 7/25/2019 (dnh).
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc., Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Nicolello, Richard)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nicolello, Richard) Modified on 7/25/2019 (dnh).
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONESICECREAMCORP., Yoel Friedman, Binyamin Yitchakov. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17303933)Document filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Nicolello, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Conesicecreamcorp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Binyamin Yitchakov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONESICECREAMCORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoel Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard J. Nicolello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?