BSD Cheryl MF LLC v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: BSD CHERYL MF LLC
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-HE3 and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 7:2019cv07132
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332rp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is not to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2019. Deposition due by 1/17/2020. Fact Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/5/2019) (mro)
September 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 9/5/2019. The Court directs Plaintiff's counsel (Jeremy Rosenberg, Esq.) to file a Notice of Appearance. Case Management Plan is signed. Pre-motion letter(s) to be submitted by February 10, 2020; opposition due February 17, 2020. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Darby Ginsberg) (wc)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Conference served on BSD CHERYL MF, LLC on August 8, 2019. Service was accepted by Jeremy Rosenberg, Esq. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Singh, Mitra)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall attend a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on September 5, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Singh, Mitra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Singh, Mitra)
July 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mitra Paul Singh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BSD Cheryl MF LLC; U.S. Bank National Association. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text contained a typographical error; party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mitra Paul Singh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Rockland;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Singh, Mitra)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 31774/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17342510).Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-HE3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service)(Singh, Mitra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BSD Cheryl MF LLC v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-HE3
Represented By: Mitra Paul Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Mitra Paul Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSD CHERYL MF LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?