Endico v. Endico et al
Plaintiff: FELIX ENDICO
Defendant: ACE ENDICO CORP., ENDICO A. WILLIAM and William A. Endico
Nominal Defendant: UFS Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv07231
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on U.F.S. Industries, Inc. on 08/20/19. Service was accepted by Mark Mazzarulli, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Felix Endico(Derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant UFS, Industries, Inc.), Felix Endico(individually). (Schoenfeld, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on U.F.S. on 08/09/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Felix Endico(Derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant UFS, Industries, Inc.), Felix Endico(individually). (Schoenfeld, Steven)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven P. Dericco on behalf of Felix Endico(Derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant UFS, Industries, Inc.). (Dericco, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER WITH RESPECT TO SERVICE OF PROCESS AND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for plaintiff Felix W. Endico and counsel for defendants William A. Endico and Ace Endico Corp. ("Defendants") as follows: 1. Defendants' undersigned counsel has accepted service of the summons issued by this Court and the complaint on behalf of each of the Defendants, and such service shall be deemed to be accepted as of August 9, 2019; 2. Defendants expressly waive any and all defenses with respect to the sufficiency of process or the service of process, and otherwise expressly reserve all other defenses; and 3. The time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint shall be extended to and including October 10, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/9/2019) (jca)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Felix Endico(Derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant UFS, Industries, Inc.), Felix Endico(individually). (Schoenfeld, Steven)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William A. Endico. (pne)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UFS Industries, Inc.. (pne)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ace Endico Corp. (pne)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion to Compel: The Clerk is instructed to issue summonses for each of the three named defendants. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (mpe) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION to Compel addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Steven R. Schoenfeld dated 08/06/2019. Document filed by Felix Endico(Derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant UFS, Industries, Inc.), Felix Endico(individually).(Schoenfeld, Steven)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Russell Schoenfeld on behalf of Felix Endico(Derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant UFS, Industries, Inc.), Felix Endico(individually). (Schoenfeld, Steven)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elyse Moy on behalf of Ace Endico Corp., William A. Endico. (Moy, Elyse)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jacobson on behalf of Ace Endico Corp., William A. Endico. (Jacobson, Andrew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Yoskowitz, Jack)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jack Yoskowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: FELIX ENDICO. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
August 5, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners FELIX ENDICO added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by FELIX ENDICO. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,.(Yoskowitz, Jack)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jack Yoskowitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jack Yoskowitz to Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summonses cannot be issued for cases opened with a Notice of Removal. (pc)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jack Yoskowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ACE ENDICO CORP., ENDICO A. WILLIAM, FELIX ENDICO. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jack Yoskowitz re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Felix Endico to CM ECF with the party text "Derivatively on behalf of nominal defendant UFS, Industries, Inc.". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jack Yoskowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc)
August 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William A. Endico, re: Complaint. Document filed by FELIX ENDICO. (Schoenfeld, Steven)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ACE Endico Corp., re: Complaint. Document filed by FELIX ENDICO. (Schoenfeld, Steven)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.F.S. Industries, Inc., re: Complaint. Document filed by FELIX ENDICO. (Schoenfeld, Steven)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ACE ENDICO CORP..(Yoskowitz, Jack)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Yoskowitz, Jack) Modified on 8/5/2019 (pc).
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 60739/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17360389).Document filed by ACE ENDICO CORP., ENDICO A. WILLIAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court summons and complaint, #2 Exhibit B - NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)(Yoskowitz, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endico v. Endico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE ENDICO CORP.
Represented By: Jack Yoskowitz
Represented By: Andrew Jacobson
Represented By: Elyse Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDICO A. WILLIAM
Represented By: Jack Yoskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Endico
Represented By: Jack Yoskowitz
Represented By: Andrew Jacobson
Represented By: Elyse Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: UFS Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELIX ENDICO
Represented By: Steven Russell Schoenfeld
Represented By: Steven P. Dericco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?