Seigel v. Structure Tone Organization et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Seigel
Defendant: Michael Melanophy, Robert Yardis, Structure Tone Organization and Pavarini NE Construction Co.
Case Number: 7:2019cv07307
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis. (O'Connor, Kevin)
September 27, 2019 Mailed a copy of #28 Memo Endorsement, to Jeffrey S. Seigel 30 Pond Hill Road Chappaqua, NY 10514. (vba)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #27 Letter, filed by Robert Yardis, Michael Melanophy, Structure Tone Organization, Pavarini NE Construction Co. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION DENIED. The Court does not give legal advice and sees no need for clarification. Defendants' reply brief remains due 9/30/2019. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff at the address on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 9/27/2019) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 26, 2019 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Michael J.P. Schewe, Esq. dated September 26, 2019 re: clarification prior to submission of reply. Document filed by Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis.(Schewe, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION OF JEFFREY S. SEIGEL IN OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S FRCP 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS. Document filed by Jeffrey S. Seigel. (sbr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S FRCP 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT. Document filed by Jeffrey S. Seigel. (sbr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Document filed by Jeffrey S. Seigel. (sbr)
September 12, 2019 Mailed a copy of #23 Memo Endorsement, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, to Jeffrey S. Seigel 30 Pond Hill Road Chappaqua, NY 10514. (aea)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #22 Letter, filed by Jeffrey S. Seigel. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss is due 9/23/2019. Defendant's reply, if any, is due 9/30/2019. Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #22 Letter, #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Responses due by 9/23/2019, Replies due by 9/30/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 9/12/2019) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Jeffrey S. Seigel dated 9/11/19 re: Pro Se Plaintiff would like to notify the District Court that he will not be filing an amended complaint in response to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Jeffrey S. Seigel.(sbr)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than September 16, 2019, plaintiff must notify the Court by letter whether (i) he intends to file an amended complaint in response to the motion to dismiss, or (ii) he will rely on the complaint that is the subject of the motion to dismiss. Chambers will mail a copy of this Order and a copy of the Motions Guide to plaintiff atthe address on the docket. (As further set forth in this order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 9/9/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ks)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis. (O'Connor, Kevin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Kevin J. O'Connor, Esq. in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(O'Connor, Kevin)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis.(O'Connor, Kevin)
August 8, 2019 Mailed a copy of #17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to Jeffrey S. Seigel 30 Pond Hill Road Chappaqua, NY 10514. (vba)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 9/6/2019. The Clerk is directed to (i) mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff at the address on the docket and (ii) terminate the letter-motion. (Doc. #16). SO ORDERED. Michael Melanophy answer due 9/6/2019; Pavarini NE Construction Co. answer due 9/6/2019; Structure Tone Organization answer due 9/6/2019; Robert Yardis answer due 9/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/8/2019) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #15 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines,,,, addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Michael J.P. Schewe, Esq. dated August 7, 2019. Document filed by Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis.(Schewe, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Mailed a copy of #15 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines, to Jeffrey S. Seigel 30 Pond Hill Road Chappaqua, NY 10514. (vba)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Acknowledgment of Service Complaints filed by Robert Yardis, Michael Melanophy, Structure Tone Organization, Pavarini NE Construction Co. ENDORSEMENT: Absent further Order, defendants' deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is 8/12/2019. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff at the address on the docket. SO ORDERED. Michael Melanophy answer due 8/12/2019; Pavarini NE Construction Co. answer due 8/12/2019; Structure Tone Organization answer due 8/12/2019; Robert Yardis answer due 8/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/6/2019) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph Schewe on behalf of Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis. (Schewe, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Joseph O'Connor, Sr on behalf of Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis. (O'Connor, Kevin)
August 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Connecticut; Case Number: 3:19-cv-00629. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 25, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The #9 stipulation for transfer of venue is noted and so ordered. The clerk is hereby directed to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/25/19. (Hall, Gregory) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE AND ORDER by Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis. (Centrella, Scott) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S. Centrella on behalf of Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis (Centrella, Scott) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis. (Centrella, Scott) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S. Centrella on behalf of Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis (Centrella, Scott) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Jeffrey S. Seigel* *30 Pond Hill Road* *Chappaqua, NY 10514* (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Jeffrey S. Seigel Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 4/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 10/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defedants. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 4/30/2019 to correct file date (Fazekas, J.). Modified on 5/3/2019 to edit text (Fazekas, J.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing fee received from Jeffrey S. Seigel: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00010142. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Melanophy, Pavarini NE Construction Co., Structure Tone Organization, Robert Yardis, filed by Jeffrey S. Seigel.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 8/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seigel v. Structure Tone Organization et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Melanophy
Represented By: Scott S. Centrella
Represented By: Michael Joseph Schewe
Represented By: Kevin Joseph O'Connor, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Yardis
Represented By: Scott S. Centrella
Represented By: Michael Joseph Schewe
Represented By: Kevin Joseph O'Connor, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structure Tone Organization
Represented By: Scott S. Centrella
Represented By: Michael Joseph Schewe
Represented By: Kevin Joseph O'Connor, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavarini NE Construction Co.
Represented By: Scott S. Centrella
Represented By: Michael Joseph Schewe
Represented By: Kevin Joseph O'Connor, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Seigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?