Ditech Financial LLC v. Pirozzi
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC
Defendant: Larry C Pirozzi
Case Number: 7:2019cv07326
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Larry C Pirozzi served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Service was accepted by Larry C. Pirozzi. Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Larry C Pirozzi. Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC.(Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Larry C Pirozzi. (dnh)
August 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
August 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicholas John Bebirian to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the parties listed on the PDF do not correspond with the parties listed on the pleading. The form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
August 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nicholas John Bebirian to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Walter Investment Management Corp. for Ditech Financial LLC. Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC.(Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Larry C. Pirozzi, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bebirian, Nicholas) Modified on 8/7/2019 (dnh).
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Larry C Pirozzi. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17381388)Document filed by Ditech Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 3012-b)(Bebirian, Nicholas) Modified on 8/7/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditech Financial LLC v. Pirozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry C Pirozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?