Xue et al v. Koenig et al
Plaintiff: Xue Feng, Calculus Trading Technology LLC and Feng Xue
Defendant: Prime Consulting International LLC and Stewart Koenig
Case Number: 7:2019cv07630
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned that the time by which Defendants in the captioned action shall move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint of Plaintiffs is extended to and including October 25, 2019. This is the first extension of time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. A signed copy of this stipulation transmitted electronically or by facsimile shall be deemed an original for all purposes. (Stewart Koenig answer due 10/25/2019; Prime Consulting International LLC answer due 10/25/2019.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/8/2019) (jwh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Stewart Koenig, Prime Consulting International LLC. (Gordon, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stewart Koenig, Prime Consulting International LLC. (sj)
August 18, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stewart Koenig; Prime Consulting International LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Calculus Trading Technology LLC, Feng Xue. (Abrams, David)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Abrams to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Abrams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Feng Xue. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
August 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Abrams. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stewart Koenig; Prime Consulting International LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Calculus Trading Technology LLC, Xue Feng. (Abrams, David) Modified on 8/16/2019 (jgo).
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Abrams, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stewart Koenig, Prime Consulting International LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17431524)Document filed by Xue Feng, Calculus Trading Technology LLC.(Abrams, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xue et al v. Koenig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Consulting International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xue Feng
Represented By: David Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calculus Trading Technology LLC
Represented By: David Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feng Xue
Represented By: David Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?