Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Green et al
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Barclays American/Mortgage Corporation, Nadja A Green and Rockland County Clerk
Case Number: 7:2019cv07699
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanne Nicole Gilberg on behalf of Rockland County Clerk. (Gilberg, Jeanne)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Nadja A Green served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Service was accepted by Nadja A. Green. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Rockland County Clerk served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Service was accepted by Rachael (refused last name), Senior Records Clerk. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Barclays American/Mortgage Corporation served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, a person authorized by the New York Secretary of State to accept service of process. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barclays American/Mortgage Corporation, Nadja A Green, Rockland County Clerk. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nadja A. Green; Barclays American/Mortgage Corporation; and Rockland County Clerk, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barclays American/Mortgage Corporation, Nadja A Green, Rockland County Clerk. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17443937)Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 3012-b)(Bebirian, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays American/Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadja A Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockland County Clerk
Represented By: Jeanne Nicole Gilberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?