Maroney v. Woodstream Corporation
Plaintiff: Gregory Maroney
Defendant: Woodstream Corporation
Case Number: 7:2019cv08294
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Gordon Blood on behalf of Henry H. Heumann, Gregory Maroney. (Blood, Timothy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aleksandr John Yarmolinets on behalf of Henry H. Heumann, Gregory Maroney. (Yarmolinets, Aleksandr)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 MOTION for Aleksandr J. Yarmolinets to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/31/2019) (jca)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 MOTION for Timothy G. Blood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/31/2019) (jca)
October 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Aleksandr J. Yarmolinets to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17856105. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #12 MOTION for Timothy G. Blood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17855711. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Aleksandr J. Yarmolinets to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17856105. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Henry H. Heumann, Gregory Maroney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Blood, Timothy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Timothy G. Blood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17855711. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Henry H. Heumann, Gregory Maroney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Blood, Timothy)
October 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yitzchak Kopel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Henry H. Heumann. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Woodstream Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Gregory Maroney, Henry H. Heumann. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Kopel, Yitzchak)
October 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Woodstream Corporation answer due 12/16/2019. (jca)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/10/2019) (jca)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jay P. Lefkowitz dated October 8, 2019. Document filed by Woodstream Corporation.(Lefkowitz, Jay)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Woodstream Corporation.(Lefkowitz, Jay)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Philip Lefkowitz on behalf of Woodstream Corporation. (Lefkowitz, Jay)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Woodstream Corporation served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. Service was accepted by Elizabeth McVey-Calunen, HR Manager. Document filed by Gregory Maroney. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Woodstream Corporation served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. Service was accepted by Kamesha James, Registered Agent. Document filed by Gregory Maroney. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Woodstream Corporation. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
September 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yitzchak Kopel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gregory Maroney. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Woodstream Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gregory Maroney. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Woodstream Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17550977)Document filed by Gregory Maroney.(Kopel, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maroney v. Woodstream Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodstream Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Maroney
Represented By: Yitzchak Kopel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?