Quatinetz v. Optio Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paul Quatinetz
Defendant: Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC and Optio Solutions LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv08576
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Conor Eric Brownell on behalf of Optio Solutions LLC. (Brownell, Conor)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Leyland Gentile on behalf of Paul Quatinetz. (Gentile, Ryan)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Shimshon Wexler dated 11/11/2019 re: Eco Shield Pest Control New York City, LLCs pre-motion letter [Doc. No. 12]. Document filed by Paul Quatinetz.(Wexler, Shimshon)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CrossCheck, Inc. for Optio Solutions LLC. Document filed by Optio Solutions LLC.(Little, Brendan)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Optio Solutions LLC.(Little, Brendan)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Aaron T. Lloyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Aaron T. Lloyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron T. Lloyd)(Lloyd, Aaron)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Pre-motion conference to be held on 11/18/19 at 4:30 pm. SO ORDERED. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/15/2019) (mml)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Aaron T. Lloyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Becky L. Caruso dated 10/14/2019 re: Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC.(Caruso, Becky)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC.(Caruso, Becky)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Becky Leigh Caruso on behalf of Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC. (Caruso, Becky)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File: Defendant Optio Solutions LLC may have until 10/25/19 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Brendan H. Little dated October 10, 2019. Document filed by Optio Solutions LLC.(Little, Brendan)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brendan Hoffman Little on behalf of Optio Solutions LLC. (Little, Brendan)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC. (dnh)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Optio Solutions LLC. (dnh)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wexler, Shimshon)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Quatinetz. (Wexler, Shimshon)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Optio Solutions LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Quatinetz. (Wexler, Shimshon)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shimshon Wexler. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Paul Quatinetz. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Shimshon Wexler. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC, Optio Solutions LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17605557)Document filed by Paul Quatinetz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Wexler, Shimshon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quatinetz v. Optio Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Quatinetz
Represented By: Shimshon Wexler
Represented By: Ryan Leyland Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco Shield Pest Control New York City LLC
Represented By: Becky Leigh Caruso
Represented By: Aaron Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optio Solutions LLC
Represented By: Brendan Hoffman Little
Represented By: Conor Eric Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?