Cocozza v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: ANTHONY COCOZZA
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv08776
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:19-cv-07114, filed on 10/29/2019. (sjo)
October 18, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 10/16/2019) (sjo)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Monsanto Company served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service was accepted by Judy Carkner, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Anthony Cocozza. (Luhana, Roopal)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monsanto Company. (pne)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roopal Premchand Luhana. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Anthony Cocozza, Monsanto Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (pne)
September 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to MDL 2741 (USDC NDCA). Document filed by ANTHONY COCOZZA.(Luhana, Roopal)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MONSANTO COMPANY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by ANTHONY COCOZZA. (Luhana, Roopal)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Luhana, Roopal)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17638096)Document filed by ANTHONY COCOZZA.(Luhana, Roopal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cocozza v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY COCOZZA
Represented By: Roopal Premchand Luhana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?