FMF Corp I et al v. Strategic Funding Source, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Harbor Park Realty, LLC, Jacob Adoni, FMF Corp I f/k/a Farmer's Market of Fort Salonga, Inc and FMF Corp I
Defendant: John Does 1-25, Strategic Funding Source, Inc d/b/a Kapitus, Jason Bishop and Strategic Funding Source, Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv08777
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Letter Plaintiff's October 30, 2019 Letter for a Pre-motion Conference, filed by Strategic Funding Source, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff may go ahead and file the Amended Complaint, on consent. A pre-motion conference on Plaintiff's contemplated motion to remand will be held on 12/13/19 at 12:30 pm. Defendants shall state their position with respect to the remand motion no later than 12/6/19. Defendants need not answer until further order of the Court. So Ordered., (Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 12:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/31/19) (yv)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Robert J. Malatak dated October 30, 2019 re: Plaintiff's October 30, 2019 Letter for a Pre-motion Conference. Document filed by Strategic Funding Source, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Malatak, Robert)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Marcus A. Nussbaum, Esq. dated October 30, 2019 re: Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Jacob Adoni, FMF Corp I, Harbor Park Realty, LLC.(Nussbaum, Marcus)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marcus Aurelius Nussbaum on behalf of Jacob Adoni, FMF Corp I, Harbor Park Realty, LLC. (Nussbaum, Marcus)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Defendants may have until 11/1/19 to respond to the Complaint. Counsel for Defendants shall convey a copy of this text-only order to counsel for Plaintiffs, who shall promptly file a notice of appearance (or, if not admitted to this Court, promptly arrange to be admitted or for Plaintiffs to be represented by counsel who is admitted). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
October 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so redesignated. (wb)
October 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Robert J. Malatak dated October 4, 2019. Document filed by Jason Bishop, Strategic Funding Source, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint, To and Including November 1, 2019)(Malatak, Robert)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Robert J. Malatak dated October 4, 2019 re: Stipulation Made to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to The Complaint, to and Including November 1, 2019. Document filed by Jason Bishop, Strategic Funding Source, Inc.(Malatak, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Letter Terminating Notices of Electronic Filing to Mr. Scott Reid Matthews, filed by Strategic Funding Source, Inc, Jason Bishop. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Scott Reid Matthews' ECF notifications. SO ORDERED., (Attorney Scott Reid Matthews terminated.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/30/19) (yv)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Robert J. Malatak dated September 27, 2019 re: Terminating Notices of Electronic Filing to Mr. Scott Reid Matthews. Document filed by Jason Bishop, Strategic Funding Source, Inc.(Malatak, Robert)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 64093/2019..Document filed by Strategic Funding Source, Inc, Jason Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Errata A-State Court Summons and Complaint)(Malatak, Robert)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Reid Matthews. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Strategic Funding Source, Inc, FMF Corp I, John Does 1-25. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party information was entered incorrectly. (pne)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Reid Matthews. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000 (MAXIMUM DOLLAR AMOUNT ALLOWED ON CM ECF). (pne)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott Reid Matthews to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney (Scott Reid Matthews). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
September 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Strategic Funding Source Holdings LLC for Strategic Funding Source, Inc d/b/a Kapitus. Document filed by Strategic Funding Source, Inc d/b/a Kapitus.(Matthews, Scott)
September 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Scott Reid Matthews to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Strategic Funding Source, Inc d/b/a Kapitus.(Matthews, Scott) Modified on 9/23/2019 (ldi).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Matthews, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 64093/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17638251).Document filed by John Does 1-25, Strategic Funding Source, Inc d/b/a Kapitus, Jason Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint)(Matthews, Scott) Modified on 9/23/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FMF Corp I et al v. Strategic Funding Source, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Represented By: Scott Reid Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Funding Source, Inc d/b/a Kapitus
Represented By: Scott Reid Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Bishop
Represented By: Scott Reid Matthews
Represented By: Robert Jerome Malatak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Funding Source, Inc
Represented By: Scott Reid Matthews
Represented By: Robert Jerome Malatak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbor Park Realty, LLC
Represented By: Marcus Aurelius Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Adoni
Represented By: Marcus Aurelius Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FMF Corp I f/k/a Farmer's Market of Fort Salonga, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FMF Corp I
Represented By: Marcus Aurelius Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?