Oles v. Sauer et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Oles
Defendant: Cook Oscar Rodriguez, FNP Lisa Sauer, Cook Richard Burke, RN Wendy Moore, Louis Torres, KM Dale Frasier, RN Maureen Johnson, Christopher Bini, RN Wayne Altman, RN Martin Davis, RN John Linen and Saul Carranza
Case Number: 7:2019cv08865
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Jonathan A. Oles 19-0168 Sullivan County Jail 4 Bushnell Ave. Monticello, NY 12701, at, on 11/18/2019 Re: #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
November 18, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 11/18/2019 Re: Judge Nelson Stephen Roman #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Wayne Altman, Christopher Bini, Richard Burke, Saul Carranza, Martin Davis, Dale Frasier, Maureen Johnson, John Linen, Wendy Moore, Oscar Rodriguez, Lisa Sauer, Louis Torres. (nb)
November 18, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wayne Altman, Christopher Bini, Richard Burke, Saul Carranza, Martin Davis, Dale Frasier, Maureen Johnson, John Linen, Wendy Moore, Oscar Rodriguez, Lisa Sauer, Louis Torres. (nb)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order, together with an information package, to Plaintiff at his address as listed on ECF and to show proof of service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Sauer, Altman, Moore, Linen, Davis, Johnson, Bini, Frasier, Rodriguez, Burke, Carranza, and Torres and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. Finally, the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 11/14/2019) (mro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
November 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
November 8, 2019 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Jonathan A. Oles 19-0168 Sullivan County Jail 4 Bushnell Ave. Monticello, NY 12701 and to SUPERINTENDENT Sullivan County Jail 4 Bushnell Ave. Monticello, NY 12701. (aea)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments.The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiffs prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiffs obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiffs address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/7/2019) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Jonathan A. Oles.(rdz)
September 26, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Prisoner Authorization, to Jonathan A. Oles 19-0168 Sullivan County Jail 4 Bushnell Ave. Monticello, NY 12701. (vba)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 10/28/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/26/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prisoner authorization)(asg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Jonathan A. Oles.(rdz)
September 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Wayne Altman, Christopher Bini, Richard Burke, Saul Carranza, Martin Davis, Dale Frasier, Maureen Johnson, John Linen, Wendy Moore, Oscar Rodriguez, Lisa Sauer, Louis Torres. Document filed by Jonathan A. Oles.(rdz)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jonathan A. Oles.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oles v. Sauer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Oscar Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNP Lisa Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Richard Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Wendy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KM Dale Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Maureen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Wayne Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Martin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN John Linen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Oles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?