United States of America v. Gurliacci et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: XYZ Corporation, JOHN DOE, Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation, Joyce P. Gurliacci, 41-60 Mary Roe and Mary Roe
Case Number: 7:2019cv09021
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation. (dnh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
October 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole B. LaBletta to RE-FILE Document No. #13 Summons Returned Unexecuted,, Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; the PDF does not correspond with the event type selected. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation.. Document filed by United States of America., REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole) Modified on 10/2/2019 (dnh).
October 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole B. LaBletta to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the party name listed in the docket entry must appear exactly as it does on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to XYZ Corporation. (dnh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mary Roe. (dnh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Doe. (dnh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joyce P. Gurliacci. (dnh)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to XYZ Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mary Roe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Doe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beneficial Homeowner, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole) Modified on 10/1/2019 (dnh).
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joyce Gurliacci, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicole B. LaBletta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand None. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $229,000. (pne)
September 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole B. LaBletta to RE-FILE Documents. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons requests should not be filed as attachments to another document; the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
September 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicole B. LaBletta to RE-FILE Document. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the civil cover sheet should not be filed as an attachment to another document. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pne)
September 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
September 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation, JOHN DOE, Joyce P. Gurliacci, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(LaBletta, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gurliacci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce P. Gurliacci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 41-60 Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Nicole B. LaBletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?