Herzog v. Farmers Insurance Group
Plaintiff: Lynne Herzog
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Group, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Farmers Group, Inc., Fire Insurance Exchange, Farmers New Century Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange and Truck Inusrance Exchange
Case Number: 7:2019cv09097
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 8). Farmers Group, Inc. answer due 12/9/2019; Farmers Insurance Exchange answer due 12/9/2019; Farmers New Century Insurance Company answer due 12/9/2019; Fire Insurance Exchange answer due 12/9/2019; Mid-Century Insurance Company answer due 12/9/2019; Truck Inusrance Exchange answer due 12/9/2019. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 11/8/2019) (mro)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #6 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Jeffrey Kramer dated Nov. 5, 2019. Document filed by Farmers Group, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers New Century Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Truck Inusrance Exchange.(Kramer, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Truck Inusrance Exchange; Farmers New Century Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
October 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Farmers Insurance Group. Document filed by Lynne Herzog. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Fraietta, Philip)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Farmers Group, Inc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Truck Insurance Exchange, Mid-Century Insurance Company, New Century Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Lynne Herzog. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fraietta, Philip)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Farmers Insurance Group served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. Service was accepted by Linda Jones, Corporate Secretary. Document filed by Lynne Herzog. (Fraietta, Philip)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Farmers Insurance Group. (jgo)
October 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lynne Herzog. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Farmers Insurance Group, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lynne Herzog. (Fraietta, Philip)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraietta, Philip)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Farmers Insurance Group. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17694381)Document filed by Lynne Herzog.(Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herzog v. Farmers Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Herzog
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers New Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Inusrance Exchange
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?