Windstream Holdings, Inc. v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Windstream Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc. and Charter Communications Operating, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv09354
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Referring Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #37 MOTION for Steven Andrew Shredl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18764367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT STATE OF MISSOURI; MISSING AFFIDAVIT;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
February 11, 2020 Filing 37 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Steven Andrew Shredl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18764367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Shredl, Steven) Modified on 2/14/2020 (vba).
January 27, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (10 in 20-cv-00121-KMK) MOTION to Seal APPELLANTS' MOTION TO ACCEPT DOCUMENTS SEALED BY THE BANKRUPTCY COURT AS PART OF THE RECORD ON APPEAL. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/17/2020) (jca)
November 26, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Grace A. Thompson In Support Of Sur-Reply; in Support re: #34 Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ross, Terence)
November 26, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-8246A, 19-B-22312 (RDD). Sur-Reply. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Ross, Terence)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Further Opposition To The Motion To Withdraw The Bankruptcy Court Reference. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/2019) (jca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 32 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Further Opposition To The Motion To Withdraw The Bankruptcy Court Reference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Terence P. Ross dated November 19, 2019. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ross, Terence)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #30 Motion for Michael L. Nepple to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Michael L. Nepple, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/12/19) (yv)
November 8, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Michael L. Nepple to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17947735. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 8, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Michael L. Nepple to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17947735. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission PHV, #2 Proposed Order, #3 MO Certificate of Good Standing, #4 IL Certificate of Good Standing)(Nepple, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-8246A, 19-B-22312 (RDD). . Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kingston, John)
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-8246A, 19-B-22312 (RDD). . Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Levitt, Jamie)
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Grace A. Thompson in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-8246A, 19-B-22312 (RDD).. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ross, Terence)
October 31, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-8246A, 19-B-22312 (RDD). . Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ross, Terence)
October 30, 2019 Filing 25 FOURTH RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Windstream New York, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Florida, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Georgia Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Georgia Telephone, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Georgia, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Holding of the Midwest, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Iowa Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Iowa-Comm, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream IT-Comm, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream KDL, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream KDL-VA, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Kentucky East, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Kentucky West, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Kerrville Long Distance, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Lakedale Link, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Lakedale, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Leasing, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Lexcom Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Lexcom Entertainment, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Lexcom Long Distance, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Lexcom Wireless, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Mississippi, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Missouri, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Montezuma, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Nebraska, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Network Services of the Midwest, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Norlight, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream North Carolina, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NorthStar, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NTI, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NuVox Arkansas, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NuVox Illinois, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NuVox Indiana, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NuVox Kansas, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NuVox Missouri, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NuVox Ohio, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NuVox Oklahoma, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream NuVox, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream of the Midwest, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Ohio, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Oklahoma, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Pennsylvania, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream SHAL Networks, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream SHAL, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Shared Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream South Carolina, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Southwest Long Distance, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Standard, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Sugar Land, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Supply, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Systems of the Midwest, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Western Reserve, LLC, Other Affiliate XETA Technologies, Inc. for Windstream Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc..(Ross, Terence)
October 30, 2019 Filing 24 THIRD RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate US LEC Communications LLC, Other Affiliate Progress Place Realty Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate RevChain Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate SM Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Southwest Enhanced Network Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Talk America of Virginia, LLC, Other Affiliate Talk America, LLC, Other Affiliate Teleview, LLC, Other Affiliate Texas Windstream, LLC, Other Affiliate The Other Phone Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Trinet, LLC, Other Affiliate TruCom Corporation, Other Affiliate US LEC of Alabama LLC, Other Affiliate US LEC of Florida LLC, Other Affiliate US LEC of Georgia LLC, Other Affiliate US LEC of Maryland LLC, Other Affiliate US LEC of North Carolina LLC, Other Affiliate US LEC of Pennsylvania LLC, Other Affiliate US LEC of South Carolina LLC, Other Affiliate US LEC of Tennessee LLC, Other Affiliate US LEC of Virginia LLC, Other Affiliate US Xchange of Illinois, L.L.C., Other Affiliate US Xchange of Indiana, L.L.C., Other Affiliate US Xchange of Michigan, L.L.C., Other Affiliate US Xchange of Wisconsin, L.L.C., Other Affiliate US Xchange, Inc., Other Affiliate Valor Telecommunications of Texas, LLC, Other Affiliate WaveTel NC License Corporation, Other Affiliate WIN Sales & Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Accucomm Networks, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Accucomm Telecommunications, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Alabama, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Arkansas, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Buffalo Valley, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Business Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream BV Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Cavalier, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Communications Kerrville, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Communications Telecom, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Concord Telephone, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Conestoga, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream CTC Internet Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream D&E Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream D&E, Inc., Other Affiliate Windstream Direct, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Eagle Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Eagle Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream EN-TEL, LLC, Other Affiliate Windstream Finance Corp. for Windstream Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc..(Ross, Terence)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Eureka Telecom, Inc., Other Affiliate Paetec Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate Conversent Communications of Rhode Island, LLC, Other Affiliate Conversent Communications of Vermont, LLC, Other Affiliate Conversent Communications Resale, L.L.C., Other Affiliate CoreComm Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate CoreComm-ATX, Inc., Other Affiliate CTC Communications Corporation, Other Affiliate CTC Communications of Virginia, Inc., Other Affiliate D&E Communications, LLC, Other Affiliate D&E Management Services, Inc., Other Affiliate D&E Networks, Inc., Other Affiliate D&E Wireless, Inc., Other Affiliate DeltaCom, LLC, Other Affiliate EarthLink Business, LLC, Other Affiliate EarthLink Carrier, LLC, Other Affiliate Equity Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate Eureka Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Eureka Networks, LLC, Other Affiliate Eureka Telecom of VA, Inc., Other Affiliate Georgia Windstream, LLC, Other Affiliate Heart of the Lakes Cable Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Infocore, Inc., Other Affiliate Info-Highway International, Inc., Other Affiliate InfoHighway of Virginia, Inc., Other Affiliate Intellifiber Networks, LLC, Other Affiliate Iowa Telecom Data Services, L.C., Other Affiliate Iowa Telecom Technologies, LLC, Other Affiliate IWA Services, LLC, Other Affiliate KDL Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate LDMI Telecommunications, LLC, Other Affiliate Lightship Telecom, LLC, Other Affiliate MASSCOMM, LLC, Other Affiliate McLeodUSA Information Services LLC, Other Affiliate McLeodUSA Purchasing, L.L.C., Other Affiliate McLeodUSA Telecommunications Services, L.L.C., Other Affiliate MPX, Inc., Other Affiliate Nashville Data Link, LLC, Other Affiliate Network Telephone, LLC, Other Affiliate Norlight Telecommunications of Virginia, LLC, Other Affiliate Oklahoma Windstream, LLC, Other Affiliate Open Support Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate PaeTec Communications of Virginia, LLC, Other Affiliate PAETEC Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate PAETEC iTel, L.L.C., Other Affiliate PAETEC Realty LLC, Other Affiliate PAETEC, LLC, Other Affiliate PCS Licenses, Inc., Other Affiliate Eureka Broadband Corporation, Other Affiliate Infohighway Communications Corporation for Windstream Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc..(Ross, Terence)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Conversent Communications Of New York, LLC, Other Affiliate A.R.C. Networks, Inc., Other Affiliate Allworx Corp., Other Affiliate American Telephone Company LLC, Other Affiliate ARC Networks, Inc., Other Affiliate ATX Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate ATX Licensing, Inc., Other Affiliate ATX Telecommunications Services of Virginia, LLC, Other Affiliate Birmingham Data Link, LLC, Other Affiliate BOB, LLC, Other Affiliate Boston Retail Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate BridgeCom Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BridgeCom International, Inc., Other Affiliate BridgeCom Solutions Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Broadview Networks of Massachusetts, Inc., Other Affiliate Broadview Networks of Virginia, Inc., Other Affiliate Broadview NP Acquisition Corp., Other Affiliate Buffalo Valley Management Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Business Telecom, LLC, Other Affiliate BV-BC Acquisition Corporation, Other Affiliate Cavalier IP TV, LLC, Other Affiliate Cavalier Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Cavalier Telephone Mid-Atlantic, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Cavalier Telephone, L.L.C., Other Affiliate CCL Historical, Inc., Other Affiliate Choice One Communications of Connecticut, Inc., Other Affiliate Choice One Communications of Maine, Inc., Other Affiliate Choice One Communications of Massachusetts, Inc., Other Affiliate Choice One Communications of Ohio, Inc., Other Affiliate Choice One Communications of Pennsylvania, Inc., Other Affiliate Choice One Communications of Rhode Island, Inc., Other Affiliate Choice One Communications of Vermont, Inc., Other Affiliate Choice One Communications Resale, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Choice One of New Hampshire, Inc., Other Affiliate Cinergy Communications Company of Virginia, LLC, Other Affiliate Conestoga Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate Conestoga Management Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Conestoga Wireless Company, Other Affiliate Connecticut Broadband, LLC, Other Affiliate Conversent Communications Long Distance, LLC, Other Affiliate Conversent Communications of Connecticut, LLC, Other Affiliate Conversent Communications of Maine, LLC, Other Affiliate Conversent Communications of Massachusetts, Inc., Other Affiliate Conversent Communications of New Hampshire, LLC, Other Affiliate Conversent Communications of New Jersey, LLC, Other Affiliate Conversent Communications of Pennsylvania, LLC, Other Affiliate Broadview Networks, Inc., Other Affiliate Connecticut Telephone & Communication Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Business Telecom of Virginia, Inc., Other Affiliate Choice One Communications of New York, Inc. for Windstream Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc..(Ross, Terence)
October 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Terence Ross to RE-FILE Document #16 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Stephen Jeffrey Rochester on behalf of Windstream Holdings, Inc.. New Address: Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP, 575 Madison Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10022, (212) 940-8529. (Rochester, Stephen)
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Terence Ross on behalf of Windstream Holdings, Inc.. New Address: Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP, 2900 K Street NW, North Tower, Suite 200, Washington, DC, USA 20007-5118, (202) 625-3676. (Ross, Terence)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/22/2019) Attorney Steven J. Reisman terminated. (ks) Modified on 10/22/2019 (ks). Modified on 11/25/2019 (ks).
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Steven J. Reisman to Withdraw as Attorney /Counsel Of Record. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reisman, Steven)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Jeffrey Rochester on behalf of Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Rochester, Stephen)
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc..(Ross, Terence) Modified on 10/29/2019 (ldi).
October 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/31/2019 (jca)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Withdraw The Reference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/16/2019) (jca)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 MOTION for Nino Przulj to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/17/2019) (jca)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 MOTION for Justin P. Mulligan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/17/2019) (jca)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 MOTION for Jonathan G. Musch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/17/2019) (jca)
October 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Jonathan G. Musch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17783432. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Jonathan G. Musch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17783432. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 MO Certificate of Good Standing, #4 IL Certificate of Good Standing)(Musch, Jonathan)
October 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Justin P. Mulligan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17783315. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Justin P. Mulligan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17783315. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 MO Certificate of Good Standing, #4 IL Certificate of Good Standing)(Mulligan, Justin)
October 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Nino Przulj to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17782553. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Nino Przulj to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17782553. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Missouri Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Illinois Certificate of Good Standing)(Przulj, Nino)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Withdraw The Reference, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Terence P. Ross dated October 16, 2019. Document filed by Windstream Holdings, Inc..(Ross, Terence)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Terence Ross on behalf of Windstream Holdings, Inc.. (Ross, Terence)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #4 MOTION for John S. Kingston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/11/2019) (jca)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Liberty Broadband Corporation for Charter Communications, Inc.. Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc..(Kingston, John)
October 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for John S. Kingston to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17750658. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for John S. Kingston to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17750658. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kingston, John)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bkar)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-8246A, 19-B-22312 (RDD).. Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(bkar)
October 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
October 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bkar)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-8246A, 19-B-22312 (RDD).Document filed by Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc..(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windstream Holdings, Inc. v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windstream Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Reisman
Represented By: Terence Ross
Represented By: Stephen Jeffrey Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Brian W. Hockett
Represented By: John Scott Kingston
Represented By: Nino Przulj
Represented By: Jonathan Musch
Represented By: Michael Lee Nepple
Represented By: Justin Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications Operating, LLC
Represented By: Brian W. Hockett
Represented By: John Scott Kingston
Represented By: Nino Przulj
Represented By: Jonathan Musch
Represented By: Michael Lee Nepple
Represented By: Justin Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?