Betancur v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Giovanni Betancur
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 7:2019cv09374
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Judith C McCarthy
Referring Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: By Order dated October 18, 2019, the Court referred this case to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy for a Report and Recommendation. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. Section 636 (c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, defendant's counsel shall file a letter by no later than November 18, 2019 advising the Com1 that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the patty or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/18/2019) (rro)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/18/2019) (rro)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (jgo)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Giovanni Betancur.(Berger, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #4 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/11/2019) (mml)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (jgo)
October 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
October 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
October 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Berger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains;. (jgo)
October 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel Berger to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Giovanni Betancur.(Berger, Daniel)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Giovanni Betancur. (Berger, Daniel)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Berger, Daniel)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Giovanni Betancur. Document filed by Giovanni Betancur.(Berger, Daniel) Modified on 10/11/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betancur v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Betancur
Represented By: Daniel Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?