Tauber v. American Express Bank FSB et al
Plaintiff: Richard Kohler and Michael Tauber
Defendant: Equifax Inc., American Express Bank FSB, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and American Express Centurion Bank
Case Number: 7:2019cv09446
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ks)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Beginning March 16, 2020, all parties to civil conferences may attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839; Access Code: 1047966. The parties should call in from a landline and announce their names before speaking. This Order is subject to revocation at any time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 3/12/2020) (va)
February 21, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall attend a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on March 25, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES, UNLESS THE CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE COUNSEL FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT(S) SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES, and as further specified in this Notice of Initial Court Conference. Walter Clark, Courtroom Deputy. (Initial Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 621, U.S. Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (rjm)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Amex may have until 3/20/20 to respond to the Complaint. In the meantime, the Court will set a date for an initial conference for the remaining parties, but Amex need not attend if the settlement is on track. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
February 20, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from John M. Lyons dated February 20, 2020. Document filed by American Express National Bank..(Lyons, John)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: American Express Bank FSB answer due 2/20/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
January 17, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #7 Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Fitzpatrick, Cealagh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 27 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Riley C. Mendoza dated January 17, 2020. Document filed by American Express National Bank.(Mendoza, Riley)
December 18, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Inc.. (dnh)
December 17, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Equifax, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Tauber. (Cabrera, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 1/17/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #7 Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Cealagh Fitzpatrick dated December 16, 2019. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Fitzpatrick, Cealagh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Fitzpatrick, Cealagh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cealagh P Fitzpatrick on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Fitzpatrick, Cealagh)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: American Express National Bank may have until 1/21/2020 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
December 12, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Riley C. Mendoza dated December 12, 2019. Document filed by American Express National Bank.(Mendoza, Riley)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Corporate Parent American Express Company, Other Affiliate Warren E. Buffett, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway for American Express National Bank. Document filed by American Express National Bank.(Mendoza, Riley)
December 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Riley Caroline Mendoza on behalf of American Express National Bank. (Mendoza, Riley)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (dnh)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Inc.. (dnh)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Express Bank FSB. (dnh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Tauber. (Cabrera, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equifax, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Tauber. (Cabrera, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Express Bank, FSB a/k/a American Express Centurian Bank, re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Tauber. (Cabrera, Matthew)
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Mitchell Cabrera to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):Summonses #4 , #5 and #6 were not issued because they were linked to a deficient pleading. Summonses #8 , #9 and #10 were not issued because they contained an 'As To:' Error; party names must appear in the 'as to' docket entry exactly as they appear in the caption on the complaint. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
October 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Matthew Mitchell Cabrera. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Richard Kohler. The party was added to the case in error. (dnh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Experian, re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Tauber. (Cabrera, Matthew) Modified on 10/21/2019 (dnh).
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equifax, re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Tauber. (Cabrera, Matthew) Modified on 10/21/2019 (dnh).
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Express, re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Tauber. (Cabrera, Matthew) Modified on 10/21/2019 (dnh).
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against American Express Bank FSB, Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Michael Tauber.(Cabrera, Matthew)
October 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Matthew Mitchell Cabrera to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the All Defendant radio button was selected; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Plaintiff name does not match. Add Michael Tauber to CM ECF. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 10/21/2019. (pc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Kohler. (Cabrera, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equifax, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Kohler. (Cabrera, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Express Bank FSB, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Kohler. (Cabrera, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Richard Kohler.(Cabrera, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cabrera, Matthew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17760800)Document filed by Richard Kohler.(Cabrera, Matthew) Modified on 10/15/2019 (pc). Modified on 10/15/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tauber v. American Express Bank FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kohler
Represented By: Matthew Mitchell Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tauber
Represented By: Matthew Mitchell Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?