Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Mulqueen et al
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Danielle N. Mulqueen and Patrick T. Mulqueen
Case Number: 7:2019cv09511
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Danielle N. Mulqueen. (km)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Patrick T. Mulqueen. (km)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIRMATION of Stephen J. Vargas in Support. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Lisa M Krakowski in Support. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Patrick T. Mulqueen served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. Service was accepted by Danielle N. Mulqueen, wife. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Danielle N. Mulqueen served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. Service was accepted by Danielle N. Mulqueen, self. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Danielle N. Mulqueen, Patrick T. Mulqueen. (pc)
October 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
October 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
October 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicholas John Bebirian. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Danielle N. Mulqueen, Patrick T. Mulqueen, Freedom Mortgage Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Freedom Mortgage Corporation for Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patrick T. Mulqueen and Danielle N. Mulqueen, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Danielle N. Mulqueen, Patrick T. Mulqueen. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17774147)Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 3012-b)(Bebirian, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Mulqueen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle N. Mulqueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick T. Mulqueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?